blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3878281

EP3878281 - USE OF ISOXAZOLINE COMPOUNDS IN POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.03.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.10.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.03.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.08.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.05.2024  [2024/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intervet International B.V.
Wim de Körverstraat 35
5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
[2021/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HECKEROTH, Anja, Regina
55270 Schwabenheim / DE
02 / ZOLLER, Hartmut
55270 Schwabenheim / DE
03 / FLOCHLAY-SIGOGNAULT, Annie
Madison, 07940 / US
04 / HUYGHE, Bruno
49071 Beaucouzé cedex / FR
 [2021/37]
Representative(s)Intervet International B.V.
Wim de Körverstraat 35
5831 AN Boxmeer / NL
[2021/37]
Application number, filing date21166872.819.12.2014
[2021/37]
Priority number, dateEP2013019900720.12.2013         Original published format: EP 13199007
[2021/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3878281
Date:15.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3878281
Date:24.05.2023
Language:EN
[2023/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:A01N43/80, A61K31/42, A61K31/422, A01P7/00
[2021/37]
CPC:
A61K31/42 (EP,RU,US); A01N43/80 (EP,RU,US); A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,RU,US); A61K31/437 (EP,US); A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US); A61K9/0053 (EP,US); A61K9/08 (EP,US);
A61P33/14 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/16]
Former [2021/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ISOXAZOLINVERBINDUNGEN BEI GEFLÜGEL[2021/37]
English:USE OF ISOXAZOLINE COMPOUNDS IN POULTRY[2021/37]
French:UTILISATION DE COMPOSÉS DE TYPE ISOXAZOLINE CHEZ LA VOLAILLE[2021/37]
Examination procedure15.03.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2022Examination requested  [2022/16]
15.03.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2023Fee for grant paid
12.04.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.04.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14816243.1  / EP3082806
Opposition(s)27.02.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
09.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.05.2023
CZ24.05.2023
DK24.05.2023
EE24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
RO24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
SK24.05.2023
SM24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
[2024/10]
Former [2024/08]AT24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
SK24.05.2023
SM24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2024/03]AT24.05.2023
FI24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2024/01]AT24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
LT24.05.2023
LV24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/51]AT24.05.2023
HR24.05.2023
RS24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/50]AT24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
GR25.08.2023
IS24.09.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/48]AT24.05.2023
SE24.05.2023
NO24.08.2023
PT25.09.2023
Former [2023/46]PT25.09.2023
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1731512  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2007075459  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2007079162  (DU PONT [US], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2009003075  (DU PONT [US], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 * * table A on pages 13, fourth compound *;
 [XD]WO2009002809  (DU PONT [US], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2009024541  (INTERVET INT BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2009080250  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2010070068  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [XD]WO2010079077  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP2308857  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18* claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2011154434  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2012107533  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2013026931  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2013026695  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *;
 [X]WO2013050302  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-18 * claim 1 *
by applicantWO2005085216
 US2007066617
 WO2007079162
 WO2009002809
 WO2009003075
 WO2009024541
 WO2009080250
 WO2010070068
 WO2010079077
    - CAS, no. 1231754-09-8
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.