blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4079274

EP4079274 - ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING A WETNESS INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.09.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ontex BV
Genthof 5
9255 Buggenhout / BE
For all designated states
Ontex Group NV
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Erembodegem / BE
[2022/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Ingenfeld, Björn
53115 Bonn / DE
02 / Saheb, Mohammed Moula
56727 Mayen / DE
03 / Lambertz, Christina
56566 Neuwied / DE
04 / Weber, Ainas
53474 Bad Neuenahr-Ahrweiler / DE
05 / Cobbaert, Dries
1770 Liedekerke / BE
 [2022/43]
Representative(s)Larangé, Françoise
Ontex BVBA
Korte Keppestraat 21
9320 Aalst / BE
[2022/43]
Application number, filing date21169677.821.04.2021
[2022/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4079274
Date:26.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4079274
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.2021
ClassificationIPC:A61F13/42, A61F13/531, A61F13/49
[2022/43]
CPC:
A61F13/42 (EP); A61F13/49001 (EP); A61F13/531 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/18]  
Former [2022/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT NÄSSEANZEIGER[2022/43]
English:ABSORBENT ARTICLES HAVING A WETNESS INDICATOR[2022/43]
French:ARTICLES ABSORBANTS DOTÉS D'UN INDICATEUR D'HUMIDITÉ[2022/43]
Examination procedure28.03.2023Examination requested  [2023/18]
28.03.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.04.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2024Fee for grant paid
10.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2017079857  (WILLHAUS KEITH RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US9789009  (JOSEPH LAVEETA [US]) [A] 1-14;
 [A]WO2019158226  (ONTEX BVBA [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US10543129  (STRASEMEIER JOHN ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP3620144  (ONTEX BVBA [BE], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *
by applicantWO2010078304
 WO2015095514
 WO2016196069
 EP3190216
 EP3342386
 WO2019125230
 EP20200171374
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.