blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3893286

EP3893286 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.12.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.08.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.03.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.09.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 22.05.2024  [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NICHIA CORPORATION
491-100 Oka
Kaminaka-cho
Anan-shi
Tokushima 774-8601 / JP
[2021/41]
Inventor(s)01 / ASAI, Kenji
Anan-shi, Tokushima, 774-8601 / JP
 [2021/41]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstraße 3
81675 München / DE
[2021/41]
Application number, filing date21170087.724.05.2017
[2021/41]
Priority number, dateJP2016010485326.05.2016         Original published format: JP 2016104853
JP2017009289909.05.2017         Original published format: JP 2017092899
[2021/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3893286
Date:13.10.2021
Language:EN
[2021/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3893286
Date:18.01.2023
Language:EN
[2023/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2021
ClassificationIPC:H01L33/50
[2021/41]
CPC:
H01L33/504 (EP,CN,US); C09K11/0883 (EP,US); C09K11/7707 (EP,US);
C09K11/7721 (EP,CN,US); C09K11/7734 (EP,CN,US); C09K11/77342 (EP,CN,US);
C09K11/77348 (EP,CN,US); C09K11/7739 (EP,US); H01L33/507 (US);
H01L33/486 (US); H01L33/52 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/14]
Former [2021/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2021/41]
English:LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE[2021/41]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT[2021/41]
Examination procedure24.02.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.02.2022Examination requested  [2022/14]
24.02.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.08.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2022Fee for grant paid
13.12.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.12.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP17172710.0  / EP3249703
Opposition(s)19.10.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
MC18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SI18.01.2023
SK18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
IE24.05.2023
LU24.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
[2024/21]
Former [2024/11]AT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
MC18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SI18.01.2023
SK18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
LU24.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
Former [2024/09]AT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
MC18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SK18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
LU24.05.2023
CH31.05.2023
LI31.05.2023
Former [2024/08]AT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
MC18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SK18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
LU24.05.2023
Former [2023/50]AT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SK18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/49]AT18.01.2023
CZ18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RO18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/48]AT18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
EE18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/46]AT18.01.2023
DK18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
SM18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/39]AT18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
IS18.05.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/38]AT18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
PL18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/37]AT18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
GR19.04.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/36]AT18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
FI18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
LV18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
SE18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/35]AT18.01.2023
ES18.01.2023
HR18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
NO18.04.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/34]ES18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
RS18.01.2023
PT18.05.2023
Former [2023/33]ES18.01.2023
LT18.01.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007205712  (RADKOV EMIL V [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] , [0073] , [0075] , [0005] , [0096] *;
 [A]US2013082289  (SAKUTA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0104] *;
 [A]US2014362885  (SAKUTA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] , [0069] , [0071] , [0072] , [0076] , [0078] , [0082] , [0088] , [0090] , [0095] , [0097] , [0146] *;
 [A]US2015349213  (HOSOKAWA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0041] , [0053] - [0056] *
by applicantJP2003535477
 JP2008034188
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.