EP3882091 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE WITH A LITHIUM BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/38] | CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC BRAKE OF A UTILITY VEHICLE WHICH HAS A LITHIUM BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | ||
[2023/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Textron Innovations Inc. 40 Westminster Street Providence, Rhode Island 02903 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARVEY, Arthur James 7092 Burwick Run Beech Island, 29842 / US | 02 /
PADGETT, Norman R. 5284 Magnolia Lane Evans, 30809 / US | 03 /
LEDDEN, John 4722 Sanctuary Court Augusta, 30909 / US | 04 /
BRADLEY, Robert Charles 71 Boy Scout Court Augusta, 30909 / US | 05 /
WARDEN, Patrick Dwaine 2045 Dundee Way Grovetown, 30813 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Taruttis, Tilman Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 103363 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 21172496.8 | 22.12.2017 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | US201615395249 | 30.12.2016 Original published format: US201615395249 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882091 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882091 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16D121/22, B60L7/22, B60L53/14, B60L58/10, B60T1/06, B60T13/74, B60T17/22 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
B60T13/748 (EP,US);
B60L1/00 (CN);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,CN,US);
B60L7/10 (US);
B60L7/22 (EP,US);
B60L7/24 (CN);
B60T1/062 (EP,US);
B60T17/22 (EP,US);
B60T7/045 (US);
H02J7/0029 (CN);
H02P15/00 (CN);
B60L2200/22 (EP,US);
B60L2240/30 (EP,US);
B60L2240/42 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (EP,US);
B60T2270/89 (US);
B60Y2200/23 (US);
B60Y2400/112 (US);
F16D2121/22 (EP,US);
H02J7/00306 (CN);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | B60T1/06, B60T13/74, B60T17/22, B60L7/22, B60L53/14, B60L58/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSSYSTEM FUER EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG MIT EINEM LITHIUMBATTERIEMANAGEMENTSYSTEM | [2023/29] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A UTILITY VEHICLE WITH A LITHIUM BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2023/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE POSSÉDANT UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE AU LITHIUM | [2023/29] |
Former [2021/38] | STEUERUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN BREMSE EINES NUTZFAHRZEUGS MIT EINEM LITHIUMBATTERIEMANAGEMENTSYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/38] | CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC BRAKE OF A UTILITY VEHICLE WHICH HAS A LITHIUM BATTERY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2021/38] | COMMANDE D'UN FREIN ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE POSSÉDANT UN SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE BATTERIE AU LITHIUM | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17210457.2 / EP3342654 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | LU | 22.12.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
IT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS62123903 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 2,6,9,10,12 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2002030405 (HARNER JOHN B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,15 * paragraph [0030] * * figure 2 * [Y] 2,6,9 [I] 7,8,11; | [XY]US2007222283 (SKINNER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,13-15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0143] * * figures 10,11 * [Y] 2,6,9,10,12; | [XA]WO2009001086 (MODEC LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,10,11,15 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 3 * * page 20, line 8 - line 18 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 3-5; | [A]WO2013006949 (CONSORTIUM DE RECH BRP UNIVERSITE DE SHERBROOKE [CA], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2015352967 (TIMPF JR THOMAS JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11,15 * paragraph [0016] * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 * |