EP3955701 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TERMINAL COOPERATION BASED ON SPARSE MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SPREADING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAAREF, Amine Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
BALIGH, Mohammadhadi Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
MA, Jianglei Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 21197012.4 | 16.12.2013 | [2022/07] | Priority number, date | US201261737643P | 14.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261737643 P | US201361791830P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361791830 P | US201313862168 | 12.04.2013 Original published format: US201313862168 | [2022/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3955701 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3955701 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/04, H04L5/00, H04L5/14, H04J13/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
H04L5/0016 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (US);
H04L5/0026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENDGERÄTEKOOPERATION BASIEREND AUF SPÄRLICHER MEHRDIMENSIONALER STREUUNG | [2022/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TERMINAL COOPERATION BASED ON SPARSE MULTI-DIMENSIONAL SPREADING | [2022/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COOPÉRATION DE TERMINAUX EN FONCTION D'UN ÉTALEMENT MULTIDIMENSIONNEL LIMITÉ | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 17.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13863140.3 / EP2932396 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB2411555 (TOSHIBA RES EUROP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,8,9,14,15 * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 3 * * figures 1, 3,8 * [Y] 4-6,11-13 [I] 7; | [XI]WO2010052800 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,15 * page 10, line 16 - line 19 * * page 16, line 3 - page 17, line 8 * * claims 1, 5, 10 * * figures 2, 4 * [I] 7; | [A]WO2010102435 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] ** paragraph [0044] *; | [Y]WO2011038672 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN], et al) [Y] 4-6,11-13 * page 8 * * page 12 *; | [XI]WO2012128505 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [I] 10; | EP2688226 [ ] (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0139] *; | [A] - REZA HOSHYAR ET AL, "LDS-OFDM an Efficient Multiple Access Technique", 2010 IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE (VTC 2010-SPRING), IEEE, US, (20100516), ISBN 978-1-4244-2518-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031696166 [A] 1,2,8,9,15 * page 1, column 2 * * page 2 - page 3 * * Section V. * | [A] - HOSHYAR R ET AL, "Novel Low-Density Signature for Synchronous CDMA Systems Over AWGN Channel", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080401), vol. 56, no. 4, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 1616 - 1626, XP011205892 [A] 1,2,8,9,15 * Section III * * abstract * * figure 1 * |