blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4033368

EP4033368 - STORAGE DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA HAVING AN EMBEDDED COMMAND IN BOTH DIRECTIONS OF A SHARED CHANNEL, AND A METHOD OF OPERATING THE STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.06.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 13.03.2024  [2024/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2022/30]
Inventor(s)01 / JO, Youngmin
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / KIM, Tongsung
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / YOON, Chiweon
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
04 / LEE, Seonkyoo
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
05 / JEONG, Byunghoon
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2023/52]
Former [2022/30]01 / JO, Youngmin
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / KIM, Tongsung
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / YOON, Chiweon
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / LEE, Seonkyoo
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / JEONG, Byunghoon
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2022/30]
Application number, filing date21209514.522.11.2021
[2022/30]
Priority number, dateKR2021000879321.01.2021         Original published format: KR 20210008793
[2022/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4033368
Date:27.07.2022
Language:EN
[2022/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4033368
Date:13.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2022
ClassificationIPC:G06F13/16, G06F13/40, G06F13/42, H04L12/403, H04L12/40, G06F3/06, H03K19/0185, H04L25/49, H04L5/14, H04L25/02
[2022/30]
CPC:
G06F13/1668 (EP); G11C16/26 (CN,KR,US); G11C16/0483 (CN,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US); G06F13/1657 (EP); G06F13/4072 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (EP); G06F3/0604 (US); G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0658 (KR); G06F3/0679 (KR,US); G06F3/0688 (EP);
G11C16/10 (KR,US); G11C16/30 (KR); G11C7/1048 (KR);
H03K19/0005 (US); H04L25/0278 (EP); H04L25/0298 (EP);
H03K19/018592 (EP); H04L5/1423 (EP); H10B43/27 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/30]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON DATEN MIT EINGEBETTETEM BEFEHL IN BEIDE RICHTUNGEN EINES GEMEINSAMEN KANALS UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DER SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG[2022/30]
English:STORAGE DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA HAVING AN EMBEDDED COMMAND IN BOTH DIRECTIONS OF A SHARED CHANNEL, AND A METHOD OF OPERATING THE STORAGE DEVICE[2022/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES AYANT UNE COMMANDE EMBARQUÉE DANS LES DEUX DIRECTIONS D'UN CANAL PARTAGÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DU DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE[2022/30]
Examination procedure22.11.2021Examination requested  [2022/30]
29.09.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2024Fee for grant paid
31.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH10327174  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2,3,4 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] *;
 [YA]US6356106  (GREEFF ROY [US], et al) [Y] 15 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 39 *[A] 1-14;
 [Y]DE102012110732  (STAHL R SCHALTGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]US2019303007  (HONG SUNG KWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1,2,3a,3b,5 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0048] *
by applicantUS7679133
 US2011233648
 US8553466
 US8559235
 US8654587
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.