EP4020904 - PACKET TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LT | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Haibo Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 02 /
HU, Xun Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 03 /
HUA, Rongrong Guangdong, 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHU, Tong Guangdong, 518129 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 21212367.3 | 03.12.2021 | [2022/26] | Priority number, date | CN202011566608 | 25.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011566608 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020904 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4020904 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP,CN,US);
H04L45/586 (US);
H04L45/34 (CN);
H04L45/42 (US);
H04L45/50 (CN);
H04L45/745 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR PAKETÜBERTRAGUNG | [2022/26] | English: | PACKET TRANSMISSION METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE PAQUETS | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 21.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2640014 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 34 * * page 5, paragraph 48 * * page 6, paragraph 60 *; | [A]US2016179598 (LVIN VYACHESLAV [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 3, 6, 8 * * page 1, paragraph 10 * * page 3, paragraph 40 ** page 4, paragraph 51 *; | [A]EP3462688 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * page 2, paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 27 * * page 10, paragraph 76 * |