blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3989473

EP3989473 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION ON MULTIPLE SPECTRUM BANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.07.2022
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2022/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHENG, Shan
16677 Suwon-si / KR
02 / TAORI, Rakesh
16677 Suwon-si / KR
 [2022/17]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2022/17]
Application number, filing date21214346.505.12.2011
[2022/17]
Priority number, dateUS201041957210P03.12.2010         Original published format: US 41957210 P
[2022/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3989473
Date:27.04.2022
Language:EN
[2022/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3989473
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2022
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00, H04W72/12, // H04W88/06, H04W16/14
[2022/17]
CPC:
H04W72/1215 (EP,US); H04W72/04 (KR); H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L5/0005 (EP,US); H04L5/0042 (EP,US); H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/006 (US); H04W28/20 (KR); H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/32]
Former [2022/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION AUF MEHREREN SPEKTRUMSBÄNDERN[2022/17]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION ON MULTIPLE SPECTRUM BANDS[2022/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL SUR UNE PLURALITÉ DE BANDES DU SPECTRE[2022/17]
Examination procedure01.07.2022Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2022Examination requested  [2022/32]
05.07.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2024Fee for grant paid
10.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11845249.9  / EP2647137
EP20175455.3  / EP3748893
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 10
14.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 11
23.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 12
23.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007153729  (ALAPURANEN PERTTI O [US]) [A] 1,5,9,13* columns 14-16 *;
 [A]WO2007091816  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 11-14; figure 10 *;
 [A]WO2008097059  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * pages 4,5,8-10; figures 6,7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.