blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4096890

EP4096890 - WOVEN FIBROUS PREFORM FOR PRODUCING A PART FROM COMPOSITE MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A TURBOMACHINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2022
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.02.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAFRAN
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[2022/49]
Inventor(s)01 / DAMBRINE, Bruno, Jacques, Gérard
c/o SAFRAN Centre d'Excellence Propriété
Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
02 / MARCHAL, Yann, Didier, Simon
c/o SAFRAN Centre d'Excellence Propriété
Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
03 / COUPE, Dominique, Marie, Christian
c/o SAFRAN Centre d'Excellence Propriété
Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
04 / COLOT, Marc-Antoine
c/o SAFRAN Centre d'Excellence Propriété
Intellectuelle Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau
77550 Moissy-Cramayel / FR
 [2022/49]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2022/49]
Application number, filing date21705588.819.01.2021
[2022/49]
WO2021FR50096
Priority number, dateFR2020000080828.01.2020         Original published format: FR 2000808
[2022/49]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021152233
Date:05.08.2021
Language:FR
[2021/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4096890
Date:07.12.2022
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4096890
Date:28.02.2024
Language:FR
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.08.2021
ClassificationIPC:B29B11/16, B29D99/00, D03D25/00, F01D5/28
[2022/49]
CPC:
B29B11/16 (EP,US); D03D25/005 (EP,US); B29C70/24 (US);
B29D99/0025 (EP,US); F01D5/282 (EP,US); F01D5/284 (EP,US);
B29L2031/087 (EP,US); F05D2230/31 (EP,US); F05D2300/20 (EP,US);
F05D2300/6034 (EP,US); Y02T50/60 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWEBTER FASERVORFORMLING ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEILS AUS VERBUNDWERKSTOFF, INSBESONDERE EINER TURBOMASCHINENSCHAUFEL[2022/49]
English:WOVEN FIBROUS PREFORM FOR PRODUCING A PART FROM COMPOSITE MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A TURBOMACHINE BLADE[2022/49]
French:PREFORME FIBREUSE TISSEE POUR REALISER UNE PIECE EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE, NOTAMMENT UNE AUBE DE TURBOMACHINE[2022/49]
Entry into regional phase12.08.2022National basic fee paid 
12.08.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.2022Examination requested  [2022/49]
12.08.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2024Fee for grant paid
09.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP3181814  (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0018] , [0020]; figure 3 *;
 [A]WO2019097147  (SAFRAN CERAM [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * figure 2; claim 1 *
by applicantWO2006136755
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.