blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4127833

EP4127833 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING A PROCESS METRIC ASSOCIATED WITH A PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.10.2021
Formerunknown
Status updated on  26.02.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASML Netherlands B.V.
P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
[2023/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBAUX, Arnaud
P.O.Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
 [2023/06]
Representative(s)ASML Netherlands B.V.
Corporate Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
[2023/06]
Application number, filing date21706332.024.02.2021
[2023/06]
WO2021EP54597
Priority number, dateEP2020016772902.04.2020         Original published format: EP 20167729
EP2020017041420.04.2020         Original published format: EP 20170414
[2023/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021197717
Date:07.10.2021
Language:EN
[2021/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4127833
Date:08.02.2023
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4127833
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.10.2021
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/20, G05B19/418, G06N3/02, G06N20/10
[2023/06]
CPC:
G03F7/705 (EP,KR); G05B19/41875 (EP,KR); G05B13/048 (KR,US);
G05B13/0265 (US); G05B17/02 (EP); G06N20/00 (EP,KR);
G06N3/006 (EP,KR); G06N5/01 (EP,KR); G06N7/01 (EP,KR);
G05B2219/32193 (EP,KR); G05B2219/32194 (EP,KR); G05B2219/45031 (EP,KR);
H01L22/10 (US); Y02P90/02 (EP,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VORHERSAGE EINER MIT EINEM PROZESS ASSOZIIERTEN PROZESSMETRIK[2023/06]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PREDICTING A PROCESS METRIC ASSOCIATED WITH A PROCESS[2023/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRÉDIRE UNE MESURE DE PROCESSUS ASSOCIÉE À UN PROCESSUS[2024/12]
Former [2023/06]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRÉDICTION D'UNE MÉTRIQUE DE PROCESSUS ASSOCIÉE À UN PROCESSUS
Entry into regional phase02.09.2022National basic fee paid 
02.09.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2022Examination requested  [2023/06]
02.09.2022Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2024Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.02.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2024Fee for grant paid
26.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2009228129  (MOYNE JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0125] , [ 126] *;
 [A]US2016148850  (DAVID JEFFREY DRUE [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0080] - [0094] - [0120] - [0124] - [0141] *;
 [A]US2019236455  (TAYLOR MATTHEW EDMUND [CA], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0078] - [0087] *;
 [A]US2020027021  (SASTRY KUMARA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0077] - [0085]; figure 11 *
by applicantUS6952253
 WO2018202361
 NL2024627
 EP20190186833
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.