blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4094243

EP4094243 - MULTI-USER MULTIVIEW DISPLAY, SYSTEM, AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.07.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2024Supplementary search reportpublished on 21.02.2024  [2024/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEIA Inc.
2440 Sand Hill Road, Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2022/48]
Inventor(s)01 / FATTAL, David A.
LEIA INC. 2440 Sand Hill Rd., Ste. 100
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
 [2022/48]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2022/48]
Application number, filing date21743976.918.01.2021
[2022/48]
WO2021US13835
Priority number, dateUS202062963493P20.01.2020         Original published format: US 202062963493 P
[2022/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021150461
Date:29.07.2021
Language:EN
[2021/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4094243
Date:30.11.2022
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2022/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.07.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:G09F9/30, G02F1/13357, G02B30/33, H04N13/359, H04N13/368, G02B27/00, G02F1/13, H04N13/32, H04N13/351
[2024/08]
CPC:
G02B27/0093 (EP,US); H04N13/32 (EP,KR); G02B30/33 (EP,US);
G02B6/0036 (US); G02B6/0076 (US); H04N13/351 (EP,KR);
H04N13/359 (EP); H04N13/366 (KR); H04N13/368 (EP);
G02F1/1323 (EP); G02F1/1336 (EP); H04N2013/40 (KR) (-)
Former IPC [2022/48]G09F9/30, G02F1/13357
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2022/48]
TitleGerman:MEHRBENUTZER-MEHRFACHANSICHTANZEIGE, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2022/48]
English:MULTI-USER MULTIVIEW DISPLAY, SYSTEM, AND METHOD[2022/48]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ MULTI-UTILISATEURS MULTIVUES[2022/48]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2022National basic fee paid 
01.08.2022Search fee paid 
01.08.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.08.2022Examination requested  [2022/48]
22.02.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2018373051  (HARROLD JONATHAN [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134]; figures 25A, 28C * * paragraph [0187] ** paragraph [0193] *;
 [XY]WO2019070317  (LEIA INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0077] * [Y] 1-15
International search[A]KR20150043875  (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-23* paragraphs [0139]-[0154]; and figures 8-9d *;
 [A]JP2015519772  (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.) [A] 1-23 * claims 1-3, 5; and figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]US2015222888  (KANG JIN-MO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0056]-[0059]; claims 1-3; and figures 5-8 *;
 [Y]US2018188441  (FATTAL DAVID A [US]) [Y] 6-7,16,22-23 * paragraphs [0074]-[0076]; and figures 7A-7B *;
 [Y]WO2019070317  (LEIA INC [US]) [Y] 1-23 * paragraphs [0034]-[0035], [0068], [0078], [0091]-[0094]; claims 12, 16; and figure 5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.