blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4112591

EP4112591 - ISOCYANATE GROUP-CONTAINING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ISOCYANATE GROUP-CONTAINING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.09.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
4-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2023/01]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKUTA Koji
c/o Silicone Electronics Materials Research
Center, SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD., 1-10
Hitomi, Matsuida-machi
Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0224 / JP
 [2023/01]
Representative(s)Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/01]Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date21760971.805.02.2021
[2023/01]
WO2021JP04297
Priority number, dateJP2020003229227.02.2020         Original published format: JP 2020032292
[2023/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2021171962
Date:02.09.2021
Language:JA
[2021/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4112591
Date:04.01.2023
Language:EN
[2023/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP02.09.2021
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:C07F7/08, C07B61/00, C08L83/08, C08G77/26, C08G77/20, C08G77/12
[2024/08]
CPC:
C07F7/0838 (EP); C07F7/10 (US); C08G77/26 (EP);
C08L83/08 (EP); C08G77/12 (EP); C08G77/20 (EP)
C-Set:
C08L83/08, C08L83/00, C08K5/56 (EP)
Former IPC [2023/01]C07B61/00, C07F7/10, B01J23/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/01]
TitleGerman:ISOCYANATGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDE ORGANISCHE SILIZIUMVERBINDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ISOCYANATGRUPPENHALTIGEN ORGANISCHEN SILIZIUMVERBINDUNG[2023/01]
English:ISOCYANATE GROUP-CONTAINING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ISOCYANATE GROUP-CONTAINING ORGANIC SILICON COMPOUND[2023/01]
French:COMPOSÉ DE SILICIUM ORGANIQUE CONTENANT UN GROUPE ISOCYANATE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ DE SILICIUM ORGANIQUE CONTENANT UN GROUPE ISOCYANATE[2023/01]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2022Translation filed 
11.08.2022National basic fee paid 
11.08.2022Search fee paid 
11.08.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2022Examination requested  [2023/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]CN110172110  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [I] 1-3* page 18 - paragraph 81; compound 8 *
International search[A]JPH08104755  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraphs [0005], [0032], example 2 *;
 [A]JPH08164679  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraph [0046], reference example 4 *;
 [A]JP2018097154  (CANON KK) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraphs [0012], [0036] *;
 [A]  - DOHERTY, M. D. et al., "Small molecule cyclic amide and urea based thickeners for organic and sc- C02/organic solutions", Energy & Fuels, (20160617), vol. 30, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acs.energyfuels.6b00859, pages 5601 - 5610, XP055760813 [A] 1-3 * , introduction, scheme 3, compound 17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.energyfuels.6b00859
by applicantJPH06228161
 JPH08104755
 JP2001026593
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.