blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4251451

EP4251451 - HYBRID DRIVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.01.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.06.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.10.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 03.04.2024  [2024/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mercedes-Benz Group AG
Mercedesstraße 120
70372 Stuttgart / DE
[2023/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HAHN, Peter
70374 Stuttgart / DE
02 / GITT, Carsten
70437 Stuttgart / DE
 [2023/40]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Group
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / Geneva / CH
[2024/14]
Former [2023/40]Scheidle, Thorsten Michael
Mercedes-Benz Intellectual Property
GmbH & Co. KG
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date21790408.506.10.2021
[2023/40]
WO2021EP77569
Priority number, dateDE2020100730730.11.2020         Original published format: DE102020007307
[2023/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022111895
Date:02.06.2022
Language:DE
[2022/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4251451
Date:04.10.2023
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4251451
Date:03.04.2024
Language:DE
[2024/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.06.2022
ClassificationIPC:B60K6/48, B60K6/547, B60K6/36, B60K6/387, F16H3/093, B60K6/40, B60K6/26
[2023/40]
CPC:
B60K6/48 (EP); B60K6/547 (EP,US); B60K6/36 (EP);
B60K6/387 (EP,US); B60K6/40 (EP); F16H3/093 (EP);
B60K2006/268 (EP); B60K2006/4808 (EP); B60K2006/4825 (EP);
B60K2006/4833 (EP); F16H2003/0931 (EP); F16H2200/0052 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/40]  
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYBRID-ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG[2023/40]
English:HYBRID DRIVE UNIT[2023/40]
French:UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT HYBRIDE[2023/40]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2023National basic fee paid 
23.05.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2023Examination requested  [2023/40]
23.05.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2024Fee for grant paid
23.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5799536  (JANISZEWSKI GRZEGORZ [SE], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * the whole document * [A] 4-7;
 [YA]JP2002031198  (AISIN AI CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * [A] 4-7;
 [A]JP2014054900  (AISIN AI CO LTD) [A] 1-10* abstract *;
 [Y]EP2902236  (AISIN AI CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0029] , [0030] , [0041] - [0046]; figures 1,5 *
by applicantFR2859410
 DE102012009484
 DE102013210013
 DE102016013477
 US2017305258
 DE102017112868
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.