EP4049589 - SYRINGE-INJECTION-TYPE BRAIN SIGNAL MEASUREMENT AND STIMULATION STRUCTURE, AND SYRINGE INJECTION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gbrain Inc. Songdo TechnoPark IT Center Building M, Room 1902 32, Songdogwahak-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21984 / KR | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Sung Gu 108-1404, 68, Landmark-ro, Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22018 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang Won 306, 16, Bupyeongmunhwa-ro 16beon-gil, Bupyeong- gu Incheon 21389 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung Won 8-607, 37, Seonhak-ro, Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21938 / KR | 04 /
AHN, Jong Hyun 206-1301, 57, Apgujeong-ro 29-gil, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06005 / KR | 05 /
CHAE, Young Cheol 201-1301, 152, Baekbeom-ro, Mapo-gu Seoul 04148 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Je Jung 303, 494-30, Seongsan-ro, Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03765 / KR | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | Patentanwälte Mammel und Maser PartG mbB Tilsiter Straße 3 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 21792535.3 | 29.03.2021 | [2022/35] | WO2021KR03833 | Priority number, date | KR20200047425 | 20.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200047425 | KR20210039903 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210039903 | [2022/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021215682 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049589 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.10.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/0031 (EP);
A61B5/293 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0002 (US);
A61B5/263 (EP,US);
A61B5/31 (EP);
A61B5/37 (EP);
A61B5/686 (EP);
A61B5/6868 (KR,US);
A61N1/0531 (EP,KR);
A61N1/0539 (KR);
A61N1/3605 (KR);
A61N1/36125 (KR);
A61N1/37211 (KR);
A61B2503/40 (EP,KR);
A61B2562/0209 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | A61B5/291, A61B5/00, A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/372 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | STRUKTUR IN FORM EINER SPRITZENINJEKTION ZUM MESSEN UND STIMULIEREN VON GEHIRNSIGNALEN UND SPRITZENINJEKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/35] | English: | SYRINGE-INJECTION-TYPE BRAIN SIGNAL MEASUREMENT AND STIMULATION STRUCTURE, AND SYRINGE INJECTION METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/35] | French: | STRUCTURE DE MESURE ET DE STIMULATION DE SIGNAL CÉRÉBRAL DE TYPE À INJECTION DE SERINGUE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'INJECTION DE SERINGUE POUR CELLE-CI | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Divisional application(s) | EP23155850.3 / EP4197434 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009018630 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014094674 (NURMIKKO ARTO V [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2018224433 (LIEBER CHARLES M [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0140] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2018227165 (NEURONOFF INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0043] * * paragraph [0307] - paragraph [0329] ** claims 9,10 *; | [A]US2020108246 (CADWELL JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0051] * * figures 1-8 *; | [Y] - PARK SUNG-WON ET AL, "Epidural Electrotherapy for Epilepsy", vol. 14, no. 30, doi:10.1002/smll.201801732, ISSN 1613-6810, (20180627), page 1801732, SMALL, URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1002%2Fsmll.201801732, XP055859911 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.201801732 | International search | [A]KR101301007B (KOREA INSTITUTE OF SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20140092238 (UNIV BROWN [US]) [A] 1-20 * See entire document. *; | [YA]KR101972931B (DAEGU GYEONGBUK INST SCIENCE & TECH [KR]) [Y] 1,7-14 * See paragraphs [0043]-[0109]; and figures 3-12. * [A] 2-6,15-20; | [A]WO2019140404 (STIMAIRE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See entire document. *; | [Y] - Park Sung-Won, Kim Jejung, Kang Minpyo, Lee Wonho, Park Byong Seo, Kim Hansung, Choi Se-Young, Yang Sungchil, Ahn Jong-Hyun, Yang Sunggu, "Epidural Electrotherapy for Epilepsy", Small, (20180701), vol. 14, no. 30, doi:10.1002/smll.201801732, ISSN 1613-6810, page 1801732, XP055859911 [Y] 1,7-14 * See page 2, left column, line 18 - page 6, left column, line 39; Experimental Section; and figures 1-4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.201801732 |