blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4244419

EP4244419 - BITUMINOUS MEMBRANES WITH BIODEGRADABLE BINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2023
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.05.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.11.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Correction of patent specificationpublished on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Freudenberg Performance Materials GmbH & Co. KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2024/19]
Former [2023/38]For all designated states
Freudenberg Performance Materials SE & Co. KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BIESER, Arno
69469 Weinheim / DE
02 / ELLMER, Katharina
20900 Monza / IT
03 / VILLING-FALUSI, Sandra
68161 Mannheim / DE
04 / LA PORTA, Antonio
68309 Mannheim / DE
05 / ASSUMMA, Luca
20831 Seregno (MB) / IT
 [2023/38]
Representative(s)Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
[2023/38]
Application number, filing date21802757.109.11.2021
[2023/38]
WO2021EP81032
Priority number, dateEP2020020719412.11.2020         Original published format: EP 20207194
[2023/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022101163
Date:19.05.2022
Language:EN
[2022/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4244419
Date:20.09.2023
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2023/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4244419
Date:03.04.2024
Language:EN
[2024/14]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification
No.:EP4244419
Date:29.05.2024
[2024/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.05.2022
ClassificationIPC:D04H1/587, D04H1/64, D04H3/12, C09D103/02, D06N5/00, C09D189/00, C09D197/00, D04H3/16
[2024/07]
CPC:
D04H1/587 (EP,US); C09D103/02 (EP); C09D189/00 (EP);
C09D197/005 (EP); C09D199/00 (US); C09D7/63 (US);
D04H1/4218 (US); D04H1/435 (US); D04H1/43835 (US);
D04H1/56 (US); D04H1/64 (EP); D04H1/645 (US);
D04H1/74 (US); D04H3/12 (EP); D04H3/16 (EP);
D06M13/07 (US); D06N5/003 (EP); D06M2101/32 (US);
D06M2200/10 (US); D10B2401/063 (US); D10B2505/00 (US) (-)
C-Set:
C09D103/02, C08L89/00, C08L97/005 (EP);
C09D189/00, C08L3/02, C08L89/06 (EP);
C09D189/00, C08L3/02, C08L97/005 (EP);
C09D189/00, C08L97/005 (EP);
C09D197/005, C08L3/02, C08L89/00 (EP);
C09D197/005, C08L89/00 (EP)
(-)
Former IPC [2023/38]D04H1/587, D04H1/64, D06N5/00, C09D103/02, C09D189/00, C09D197/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BITUMINÖSE MEMBRANEN MIT BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREM BINDEMITTEL[2023/38]
English:BITUMINOUS MEMBRANES WITH BIODEGRADABLE BINDER[2023/38]
French:MEMBRANES BITUMINEUSES À LIANT BIODÉGRADABLE[2023/38]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2023National basic fee paid 
30.03.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.03.2023Examination requested  [2023/38]
30.03.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.11.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2024Fee for grant paid
27.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5164545  ;
 [AD]US2011003522  (CHEN LIANG [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * example 1 *;
 [AD]WO2013057086  (POLITEX S A S DI FREUDENBERG POLITEX S R L [IT], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1, 13, 18 *;
 [AD]EP2730631  (JOHNS MANVILLE [US]) [AD] 1-15 * claims 1, 21 *;
 [AD]FR3032195  (SAINT-GOBAIN ADFORS [FR], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, lines 16-19; claim 11 *;
 [XA]WO2017194717  (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [X] 15 * Adhesive example, entry 24; page 36 * [A] 1-14;
 [AD]US2019135688  (HJELMGAARD THOMAS [DK]) [AD] 1-15 * example 11 *;
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1976, no. 29, Database accession no. 1976-55174X, XP002805560 & JPS5164545 A 19760604 (HOHNEN OIL KK) [A] 15 * abstract *
by applicantUS2008214716
 US2011003522
 WO2013057086
 EP2730631
 FR3032195
 EP3299514
 US2019135688
    - Chemistry and significance of condensed tannins, Plenum Press, (19890000), page 323
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.