blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4171180

EP4171180 - OPTICAL CAGE ASSEMBLY AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.01.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2023/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Dingding
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / WANG, Jianyang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / LI, Chaoxing
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / YUAN, Changfa
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2023/17]
Representative(s)Maiwald GmbH
Engineering
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
[2023/17]
Application number, filing date21832357.424.06.2021
[2023/17]
WO2021CN102212
Priority number, dateCN20201060106528.06.2020         Original published format: CN202010601065
[2023/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022001839
Date:06.01.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4171180
Date:26.04.2023
Language:EN
[2023/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.01.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:H05K1/18, G02B6/42, H01R12/71, // H05K1/02
[2024/08]
CPC:
G02B6/428 (EP); H05K1/182 (CN,KR); G02B6/4257 (EP,KR);
H05K1/181 (EP); G02B6/4277 (EP); H05K1/0269 (EP);
H05K1/0274 (EP); H05K2201/10121 (EP); H05K2201/1059 (EP);
H05K2201/2018 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2023/17]H05K1/18, G02B6/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/17]
TitleGerman:OPTISCHE KÄFIGANORDNUNG UND OPTISCHE KOMMUNIKATIONSAUSRÜSTUNG[2023/17]
English:OPTICAL CAGE ASSEMBLY AND OPTICAL COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT[2023/17]
French:ENSEMBLE CAGE OPTIQUE ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE COMMUNICATION OPTIQUE[2023/17]
Entry into regional phase20.01.2023Translation filed 
20.01.2023National basic fee paid 
20.01.2023Search fee paid 
20.01.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
20.01.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.01.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2023Examination requested  [2023/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007223208  (TANAKA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0064]; figure 7 *;
 [XI]CN110797716  (WENZHOU YIHUA CONNECTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document * [I] 8-10
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.