blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4205814

EP4205814 - MASK EAR LOOP, MASK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MASK EAR LOOP, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MASK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.03.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2024Supplementary search reportpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAIO PAPER CORPORATION
2-60 Mishimakamiya-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0492 / JP
[2023/27]
Inventor(s)01 / UJIIE, Kodai
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
02 / MANABE, Sadanao
Tokyo 102-0071 / JP
 [2023/27]
Representative(s)Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
[2023/27]
Application number, filing date21861275.213.08.2021
[2023/27]
WO2021JP29799
Priority number, dateJP2020014484328.08.2020         Original published format: JP 2020144843
[2023/27]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022044847
Date:03.03.2022
Language:JA
[2022/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4205814
Date:05.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.03.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:A41D13/11, A62B23/02, A62B18/08
[2024/09]
CPC:
A62B23/025 (EP); A41D13/1161 (EP); A62B18/084 (EP)
Former IPC [2023/27]A62B18/02, A41D13/11
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/27]
TitleGerman:OHRSCHLAUFE FÜR MASKE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OHRSCHLAUFE FÜR EINE MASKE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MASKE[2023/27]
English:MASK EAR LOOP, MASK, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MASK EAR LOOP, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING MASK[2023/27]
French:BOUCLE LATÉRALE DE MASQUE, MASQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE BOUCLE LATÉRALE DE MASQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MASQUE[2023/27]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2022Translation filed 
13.09.2022National basic fee paid 
13.09.2022Search fee paid 
13.09.2022Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2022Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2022Examination requested  [2023/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2007021029  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0023] - [0052]; figures 1-5, 8 *;
 [A]CN101537237  (KANG NA HSIUNG ENTPR CO LTD) [A] 7,8,10* figures 7, 8 *;
 [Y]US2018147094  (TAKEUCHI TOMONARI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0074] , [0 92] - [0102] - [ 130] - [0144]; figures 2-10, 22-26 *
International search[A]JPH0475554U  (SUGIYAMA KK) [A] 1-10* entire text all drawings *;
 [A]JPH0666708U  (MATSUMOTO, Setsuko) [A] 1-10 * entire text all drawings *;
 [A]JP3063121U  (DI, Junliang) [A] 1-10 * entire text all drawings *;
 [A]JP2001245998  (UNI CHARM CORP) [A] 1-10 * entire text all drawings *;
 [A]JP2007021029  (DAIO SEISHI KK) [A] 1-10 * entire text all drawings *;
 [A]JP2016137119  (SHIROBATO:KK) [A] 1-10 * entire text all drawings *
by applicantJPS5762803
 JP2020144843
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.