blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4203588

EP4203588 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FRONTHAUL TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.03.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2023/26]
Inventor(s)01 / LIM, Hyoungjin
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / KIM, Daehoon
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / KIM, Bongjin
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
04 / SONG, Moongun
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
05 / OH, Jongho
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
06 / HWANG, Wonjun
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2023/26]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2023/26]
Application number, filing date21869802.517.09.2021
[2023/26]
WO2021KR12850
Priority number, dateKR2020012010517.09.2020         Original published format: KR 20200120105
[2023/26]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022060180
Date:24.03.2022
Language:KO
[2022/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4203588
Date:28.06.2023
Language:EN
[2023/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR24.03.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2024
ClassificationIPC:H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04W88/08, H04W92/24
[2023/26]
CPC:
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR); H04W72/23 (KR); H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0028 (KR); H04L5/0094 (EP); H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W88/085 (EP,KR); H04W92/24 (KR); H04L27/2602 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/26]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FRONTHAUL-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2023/26]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FRONTHAUL TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2023/26]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION FRONTHAUL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2023/26]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2023Translation filed 
23.03.2023National basic fee paid 
23.03.2023Search fee paid 
23.03.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2023Examination requested  [2023/26]
24.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XPA]EP3836420  (MAVENIR NETWORKS INC [US]) [XP] 1,7,13,14 * paragraphs [0022] , [0 23] , [0 47] , [0 48] *[A] 2-6,8-12
International search[A]US2019289497  (RAJAGOPAL SRIDHAR [US]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0081]-[0175]; and figures 1-6. *;
 [A]US2020092229  (LEVI DOTAN DAVID [IL], et al) [A] 1-14* See paragraphs [0066]-[0068]; and figure 5. *;
 [A]WO2020080838  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0093]-[0102]; and figures 4A-4B. *;
 [A]WO2020110005  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0044] and [0061]-[0103]; claim 12; and figures 2A-2B, 5 and 11A-16. *;
 [A]  - O-RAN Fronthaul Working Group, "O-RAN Fronthaul Working Group; Control, User and Synchronization Plane Specification", O-RAN.WG4.CUS.0-v04.00 Technical Specification, US, (20200701), pages 1 - 258, XP009534606 [A] 2,5-6,8,11-12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.