blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4316039

EP4316039 - POWER HEADROOM REPORT FOR INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / FAKOORIAN, Seyed Ali Akbar
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / ZHANG, Yushu
Beijing 100022 / CN
03 / YE, Chunxuan
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / ZHANG, Dawei
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / SUN, Haitong
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
06 / HE, Hong
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
07 / NIU, Huaning
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
08 / CUI, Jie
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
09 / ZENG, Wei
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
10 / YANG, Weidong
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Zacco Denmark A/S
Arne Jacobsens Allé 15
2300 Copenhagen S / DK
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date21933827.431.03.2021
[2024/06]
WO2021CN84660
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022205162
Date:06.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4316039
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:H04W52/46
[2024/06]
CPC:
H04W52/365 (EP,KR,US); H04L5/14 (KR); H04W52/242 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP,KR,US); H04W84/047 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSRESERVEBERICHT FÜR INTEGRIERTEN ZUGANG UND BACKHAUL[2024/06]
English:POWER HEADROOM REPORT FOR INTEGRATED ACCESS AND BACKHAUL[2024/06]
French:RAPPORT DE MARGE DE PUISSANCE POUR ACCÈS ET RACCORDEMENT INTÉGRÉS[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2023National basic fee paid 
14.09.2023Search fee paid 
14.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
06.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2020114030  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 8-10 * description, pages 39-42 *;
 [A]WO2020169206  (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [XYA]WO2021020350  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,6,7,16 * description,paragraphs [0055]-[0073],[0101] * [Y] 8-10 [A] 2-5,11-15,17-20;
 [A]  - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Enhancements for simultaneous operation of MT and DU", 3GPP Draft; R1-2007595, (20201024), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 9, XP051946436 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.