blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4322364

EP4322364 - CELL CAPABILITY INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, CELL RESELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33
Middle Xierqi Road
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
[2024/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HONG, Wei
Beijing 100085 / CN
 [2024/07]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2024/07]
Application number, filing date21935580.709.04.2021
[2024/07]
WO2021CN86116
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022213351
Date:13.10.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4322364
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN13.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:H02J7/00, H04W36/00
[2024/07]
CPC:
H04W48/16 (EP); H02J7/00 (EP); H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W48/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON ZELLKAPAZITÄT, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZELLENNEUAUSWAHL UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2024/07]
English:CELL CAPABILITY INDICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, CELL RESELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2024/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'INDICATION DE CAPACITÉ DE CELLULE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RESÉLECTION DE CELLULE, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE[2024/07]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2023Translation filed 
06.11.2023National basic fee paid 
06.11.2023Search fee paid 
06.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2013135497  (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-27* entire document *;
 [A]US2015288207  (WALKER JR JEFFREY ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *;
 [X]CN104979864  (HTC CORP) [X] 1-27 * description, paragraphs [0029] and [0047]-[0068], and figures 1, 4 and 6 *;
 [A]CN105493529  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.