blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4339227

EP4339227 - THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND, MOLDED BODY, AND OPTICAL SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.11.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
16.02.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 20.03.2024  [2024/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JNC Corporation
2-1, Otemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8105 / JP
[2024/12]
Inventor(s)01 / KOSUGI, Misa
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8551 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Naoya
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8551 / JP
03 / IKENO, Hironori
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290-8551 / JP
04 / TAKEE, Ayako
Tokyo 100-8105 / JP
 [2024/12]
Representative(s)Becker, Eberhard
Becker Kurig & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Bavariastraße 7
80336 München / DE
[2024/12]
Application number, filing date21941999.116.11.2021
[2024/12]
WO2021JP42031
Priority number, dateJP2021008211914.05.2021         Original published format: JP 2021082119
[2024/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022239271
Date:17.11.2022
Language:JA
[2022/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4339227
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:C08G77/20, C08L83/07, H01L33/56
[2024/12]
CPC:
H01L33/56 (EP,KR,US); C08L83/04 (EP,KR); C08G77/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/12 (KR); C08G77/14 (KR); C08G77/26 (US);
C08G77/80 (KR,US); C09K3/1018 (US); C09K2200/0685 (US);
H01L2933/005 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WÄRMEHÄRTENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, ORGANOSILICIUMVERBINDUNG, FORMKÖRPER UND OPTISCHES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT[2024/12]
English:THERMOSETTING RESIN COMPOSITION, ORGANOSILICON COMPOUND, MOLDED BODY, AND OPTICAL SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE[2024/12]
French:COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE THERMODURCISSABLE, COMPOSÉ ORGANOSILICIUM, CORPS MOULÉ ET DISPOSITIF À SEMICONDUCTEUR OPTIQUE[2024/12]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2023Translation filed 
26.09.2023National basic fee paid 
26.09.2023Search fee paid 
26.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2012031354  (JNC CORP) [A] 1-13 * claims, paragraph [0128] *;
 [A]JP2015172146  (JNC CORP) [A] 1-13 * claims *;
 [A]JP2017078103  (JNC CORP) [A] 1-13 * claims *;
 [A]JP2017119848  (JNC CORP) [A] 1-13* claims *;
 [A]WO2020116198  (JNC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * claims *;
 [A]  - Mituła K., Duszczak J., Brząkalski D., Dudziec B., Kubicki M., Marciniec B., "Tetra-functional double-decker silsesquioxanes as anchors for reactive functional groups and potential synthons for hybrid materials", Chemical Communications, Royal Society of Chemistry, UK, UK , (20170101), vol. 53, no. 75, doi:10.1039/C7CC03958A, ISSN 1359-7345, pages 10370 - 10373, XP093004780 [A] 1-13 * in particular, schemes 1, 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C7CC03958A
by applicantJP2018227629
 JP4379120B
 WO2011145638
 JP2012031354
 JP5704168B
 JP5880556B
 JP2020090593
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.