EP4035830 - SANDING MACHINE FOR SANDING/FINISHING PANELS MADE OF WOOD, METAL, PLASTIC OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 61122 Pesaro (PU) / IT | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDUCCI, Fabio 61122 Pesaro (PU) / IT | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Viale Antonio Silvani, 6 40122 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Manconi, Stefano, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22153663.4 | 27.01.2022 | [2022/31] | Priority number, date | IT20210001613 | 27.01.2021 Original published format: IT202100001613 | [2022/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035830 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B7/28, B24B21/10 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B24B21/10 (EP);
B24B7/06 (EP);
B24B7/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] |
Former [2022/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMASCHINE ZUM SCHLEIFEN/ENDBEARBEITEN VON AUS HOLZ, KUNSTSTOFF ODER DERGLEICHEN HERGESTELLTEN PLATTEN | [2022/31] | English: | SANDING MACHINE FOR SANDING/FINISHING PANELS MADE OF WOOD, METAL, PLASTIC OR THE LIKE | [2022/31] | French: | MACHINE DE SABLAGE POUR LE SABLAGE/LA FINITION DE PANNEAUX EN BOIS, EN MÉTAL, EN PLASTIQUE OU ANALOGUE | [2022/31] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 21.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0803324 (SCM GROUP AUTEC DIVISION SPA [IT]) [Y] 16* figure 2 *; | [Y]EP2965864 (E M C S R L [IT]) [Y] 9,11 * paragraph [0076]; figures 6a-6d *; | [XY]WO2019138315 (COSTA LEVIGATRICI SPA [IT]) [X] 1-8,10,12-15 * page 2, line 30; figures 2,4-7 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 19 * * page 12, lines 3-29 * * page 11, lines 8-25 * [Y] 9,11,16 |