EP4053561 - SMART SAMPLE CONTAINER FOR COMPLEX SAMPLE EVALUATION WORKFLOWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEI Company 5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive Hillsboro, OR 97124-5793 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoenmakers, Remco 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Willigen, Bert 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Perquin, Reinier deceased / NL | 04 /
Kramer, Pepijn 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Algra, Egbert 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
McCormack, Jamie 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
Varslot, Trond 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
Caglar, Faruk 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Janssen, Francis-Paul FEI Company Patent Department P.O.Box 1745 5602 BS Eindhoven / NL | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22159134.0 | 28.02.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US202117193593 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US202117193593 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053561 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G01N35/00732 (EP,US);
G01N35/00871 (EP,KR,US);
G01N35/00 (CN);
B01L3/5025 (EP);
B01L3/545 (EP,US);
G01N23/2204 (KR);
G01N23/225 (KR);
G01N35/0092 (KR);
G06Q10/103 (CN);
B01L2200/147 (EP);
B01L2200/18 (EP);
B01L2300/02 (EP);
B01L2300/021 (EP);
B01L2300/022 (EP);
B01L2300/024 (EP);
B01L2300/0663 (EP);
G01N2035/00742 (KR);
G01N2035/00821 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTER PROBENBEHÄLTER FÜR KOMPLEXE PROBENAUSWERTUNGSARBEITSABLÄUFE | [2022/36] | English: | SMART SAMPLE CONTAINER FOR COMPLEX SAMPLE EVALUATION WORKFLOWS | [2022/36] | French: | CONTENANT D'ÉCHANTILLONS INTELLIGENT POUR LES FLUX DE TRAVAIL COMPLEXES D'ÉVALUATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012330564 (BLAND LOREN L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0087] *; | [XA]US2019234975 (POTHINI SHAKILA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0018] *[A] 3-15 |