Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4082410 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4082410



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 449
20.03.2025 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.03.2025 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.03.2025 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.03.2025 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
05.03.2025 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
05.03.2025 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.11.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.11.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.11.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.11.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.11.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
06.11.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 45
18.10.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.05.2024 Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
29.04.2024 Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
02.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
02.05.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.05.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
02.05.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
02.05.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
02.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.11.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.10.2022 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.09.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.09.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 6
22.09.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
22.09.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.09.2022 Search started Search / examination 1
30.05.2022 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
24.05.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 77
24.05.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 75
24.05.2022 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 71
19.04.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.04.2022 Claims Search / examination 5
19.04.2022 Description Search / examination 20
19.04.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.04.2022 Drawings Search / examination 19
19.04.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5