blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4119281

EP4119281 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF ELECTRODE PLATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SECONDARY BATTERY, ELECTRODE PLATE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prime Planet Energy & Solutions, Inc.
2-1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi
Chuo-ku
Tokyo
103-0022 / JP
[2023/03]
Inventor(s)01 / TSUKAMOTO, Kentaro
Tokyo, 103-0022 / JP
02 / MAGARI, Yoshifumi
Tokyo, 103-0022 / JP
 [2023/03]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2023/03]
Application number, filing date22181789.329.06.2022
[2023/03]
Priority number, dateJP2021011799416.07.2021         Original published format: JP 2021117994
[2023/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4119281
Date:18.01.2023
Language:EN
[2023/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:B23K26/0622, B23K26/362, B23K26/38, H01M4/133, H01M4/1393, H01M4/66, H01M10/0525, H01M50/533, B23K101/36, B23K101/38, B23K103/12, B23K103/00, // H01M4/587
[2023/03]
CPC:
H01M50/533 (EP,US); H01M4/04 (EP,KR,US); B23K26/0622 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/362 (EP); B23K26/38 (EP,KR,US); H01M4/0404 (KR);
H01M4/13 (KR); H01M4/133 (EP,US); H01M4/1393 (EP,US);
H01M4/583 (US); H01M4/661 (EP,KR); H01M4/662 (US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US); B23K2101/38 (EP); B23K2103/12 (EP);
B23K2103/50 (EP); H01M10/0525 (EP); H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2004/027 (US); H01M4/587 (EP); Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER EKTRODENPLATTE, VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, ELEKTRODENPLATTE, UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE[2023/03]
English:MANUFACTURING METHOD OF ELECTRODE PLATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF SECONDARY BATTERY, ELECTRODE PLATE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY[2023/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLAQUE D'ÉLECTRODE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, PLAQUE D'ÉLECTRODE, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE[2023/03]
Examination procedure29.06.2022Examination requested  [2023/03]
11.07.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2016208686  (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [X] 1,8-14 * claims 1, 4 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] *[I] 2-7;
 [E]EP4037008  (PRIME PLANET ENERGY & SOLUTIONS INC [JP]) [E] 1,3,4,7-14 * claims 1-15 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0086] * * figures 5, 14 *;
 [E]EP4037089  (PRIME PLANET ENERGY & SOLUTIONS INC [JP]) [E] 1,3,4,7-14 * claims 1-11 * * figures 10, 13 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0083] *
by applicantJP2010034009
 JP2016033912
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.