blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4134485

EP4134485 - METHOD FOR STABILIZING RAILWAY BALLAST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.09.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.01.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HP3 Real GmbH
Lainzer Straße 16/5
1130 Wien / AT
[2023/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Lichtberger, Bernhard
1030 Wien / AT
02 / Hofer, Hansjörg
4502 St. Marien / AT
 [2023/07]
Representative(s)Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH
Spittelwiese 4
4020 Linz / AT
[2023/07]
Application number, filing date22186276.621.07.2022
[2023/07]
Priority number, dateAT2021005065412.08.2021         Original published format: AT 506542021
[2023/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4134485
Date:15.02.2023
Language:DE
[2023/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4134485
Date:14.02.2024
Language:DE
[2024/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2023
ClassificationIPC:E01B27/17, E01B27/20, E01B35/06
[2023/07]
CPC:
E01B27/17 (EP,AT); E01B27/20 (EP,AT); E01B35/06 (EP,AT)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/35]  
Former [2023/07]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STABILISIEREN DER SCHOTTERBETTUNG EINES GLEISES[2023/07]
English:METHOD FOR STABILIZING RAILWAY BALLAST[2023/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION DU LIT DE BALLAST D'UNE VOIE[2023/07]
Examination procedure25.07.2023Examination requested  [2023/35]
25.07.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.09.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2024Fee for grant paid
03.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2018082798  (PLASSER & THEURER EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-4 ** the whole document *;
 [A]WO2019140467  (HP3 REAL GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2020233933  (PLASSER & THEURER EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-12 * * the whole document *
by applicantWO2008009314
 EP2902546
 EP3209832
 EP3752675
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.