blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4160410

EP4160410 - CLOUD NATIVE SOFTWARE-DEFINED NETWORK ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2023
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.03.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip06.10.2023The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
06.10.2023Request for examination filedpublished on 08.11.2023  [2023/45]
06.10.2023Change - designated statespublished on 08.11.2023  [2023/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Juniper Networks, Inc.
1133 Innovation Way
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2023/14]
Inventor(s)01 / SIVAKUMAR, Mahesh
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
02 / NADEEM, FNU
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
03 / AKKIPEDDI, Srinivas
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
04 / HENKEL, Michael
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
05 / MIRIYALA, Prasad
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
06 / SINGH, Gurminder
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
07 / MOGHE, Atul S
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
08 / WILLIAMS, Joseph
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
09 / CHRISTOBER, Ignatious Johnson
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
10 / MARSHALL, Jeffrey S.
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
11 / MAYNATTAMAI, Nagendra
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
12 / DAVIS, Dale
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
13 / THULEAU, Édouard
Sunnyvale, 94089 / US
 [2023/14]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
3 Noble Street
London EC2V 7BQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2023/14]D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date22188195.602.08.2022
[2023/14]
Priority number, dateIN20214104492404.10.2021         Original published format: IN202141044924
US20221765759631.03.2022         Original published format: US202217657596
[2023/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4160410
Date:05.04.2023
Language:EN
[2023/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:G06F9/50, H04L41/00, // H04L67/00, H04L41/0806
[2023/14]
CPC:
G06F9/5072 (EP); H04L41/0895 (EP); H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L41/5045 (EP); H04L41/5058 (EP); H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L41/122 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/45]
Former [2023/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CLOUD-NATIVE SOFTWARE-DEFINIERTE NETZWERKARCHITEKTUR[2023/14]
English:CLOUD NATIVE SOFTWARE-DEFINED NETWORK ARCHITECTURE[2023/14]
French:ARCHITECTURE DE RÉSEAU DÉFINIE PAR LOGICIEL ET NATIVE EN NUAGE[2023/14]
Examination procedure04.10.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2023Examination requested  [2023/45]
04.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US10944691  (RAUT ABHISHEK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * Sections: - Container-Based Network Policy Configuration - Label Assignment, - Example Container-Based Network Policy Configuration - Container-Based Connectivity Checks *;
 [I]US2021218652  (RAUT ABHISHEK [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0093] *;
 [I]  - Ping Song ET AL, "DAY ONE: BUILDING CONTAINERS WITH KUBERNETES AND CONTRAIL DAY ONE: BUILDING CONTAINERS WITH KUBERNETES AND CONTRAIL", (20190101), pages 1 - 283, URL: https://www.juniper.net/documentation/en_US/day-one-books/day-one-containers-kubernetes-contrail.pdf, (20221205), XP093005082 [I] 1-15 * Chapter 4: Kubernetes and Contrail Integration. *
 [A]  - Doerrfeld Bill, "Ways to Extend the Core Kubernetes API - Container Journal", (20181017), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://containerjournal.com/topics/container-management/ways-to-extend-the-core-kubernetes-api/, (20221207), XP093005932 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS19320176496
 WO2013US44378
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.