blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4325200

EP4325200 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VALIDATING A FILTER UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Correction of patent applicationpublished on 22.05.2024  [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sartorius Stedim Biotech GmbH
August-Spindler-Straße 11
37079 Göttingen / DE
[2024/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Austerjost, Jonas
37079 Göttingen / DE
02 / Söldner, Robert
37079 Göttingen / DE
03 / Rafigh, Mehran
37079 Göttingen / DE
04 / Scholz, Jochen
37079 Göttingen / DE
 [2024/08]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2024/08]
Application number, filing date22191186.019.08.2022
[2024/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4325200
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/08]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP4325200
Date:22.05.2024
[2024/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2023
ClassificationIPC:G01N15/08
[2024/08]
CPC:
G01N15/082 (EP); G01N15/01 (EP); G01N15/1031 (EP);
G01N2015/084 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VALIDIERUNG EINER FILTEREINHEIT[2024/08]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VALIDATING A FILTER UNIT[2024/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE VALIDATION D'UNE UNITÉ DE FILTRATION[2024/08]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO0139870  (NORIT MEMBRAAN TECH BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - line 13; figure 1 * * page 3, line 30 - page 8, line 9 * * page 10, line 1 - line 32 * [A] 14,15;
 [A]US2010097605  (MURAKAMI SEIGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *;
 [XY]EP2755025  (AMPHASYS AG TECHNOPARK LUCERNE [CH]) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0028] * [Y] 1-13;
 [A]US8991235  (JONS STEVEN D [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 41 - line 44 ** column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.