blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4343898

EP4343898 - COMBINATION OF POROUS TRANSPORT LAYER AND BIPOLAR PLATE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2024Correction of patent applicationpublished on 15.05.2024  [2024/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
iGas energy GmbH
Cockerillstraße 100
52222 Stolberg / DE
[2024/13]
Inventor(s)01 / BORGARDT, Elena
52222 Stolberg / DE
02 / LENTZ, Karl-Heinz
52222 Stolberg / DE
 [2024/15]
Former [2024/13]01 / * * *
02 / * * *
Representative(s)Meinken, Claudia
MZPatent
Königsallee 27
40212 Düsseldorf / DE
[2024/13]
Application number, filing date22196772.221.09.2022
[2024/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4343898
Date:27.03.2024
Language:DE
[2024/13]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP4343898
Date:15.05.2024
[2024/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2023
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M8/0232, // H01M8/0245
[2024/13]
CPC:
H01M8/0232 (EP); H01M4/8605 (EP); H01M4/8657 (EP);
H01M4/8807 (EP); H01M8/0245 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION VON PORÖSER TRANSPORTSCHICHT UND BIPOLARPLATTE FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLEN[2024/13]
English:COMBINATION OF POROUS TRANSPORT LAYER AND BIPOLAR PLATE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS[2024/13]
French:COMBINAISON D'UNE COUCHE DE TRANSPORT POREUSE ET D'UNE PLAQUE BIPOLAIRE POUR CELLULES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES[2024/13]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0629015  (PERMELEC SPA NORA [IT]) [X] 1,3,4,12-15 * claims 1-26 * [I] 2,5-11;
 [XI]WO0069003  (LYNNTECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,12-15 * abstract * * claims 1-16 * [I] 2,5-11;
 [A]EP3331075  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-14 ** paragraph [0023] *
by applicantUS6280870
 WO2004086542
 US8945790
 EP2985096
 DE102015111918
 WO2018078157
 WO2020020467
 EP3686318
 EP3011625
 EP3958360
    - GRIGORIEV, S.A.P. MILLETS.A. VOLOBUEVV.N. FATEEV, "Optimization of porous current collectors for PEM water electrolysers", International Journal of Hydrogen Energy, (20090000), vol. 34, no. 11, doi:10.1016/j.ijhydene.2008.11.056, pages 4968 - 4973, XP026148731

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2008.11.056
    - AYERS, K.E.E.B. ANDERSONC. CAPUANOB. CARTERL. DALTONG. HANLONJ. MANCOM. NIEDZWIECKI, "Research Advances towards Low Cost, High Efficiency PEM Electrolysis", ECS Transactions, (20100000), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1149/1.3484496, pages 3 - 15, XP055396086

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.3484496
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.