blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4151172

EP4151172 - SYSTEM WITH GUIDES AND TOOLS OF DIFFERENT FLEXIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.10.2023
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.08.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.02.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuitive Surgical Operations, Inc.
1020 Kifer Road
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2023/12]
Inventor(s)01 / AU, Samuel Kwok Wai
Mountain View, 94043 / US
 [2023/12]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
80 Turnmill Street
London EC1M 5QU / GB
[2023/12]
Application number, filing date22206477.603.09.2015
[2023/12]
Priority number, dateUS201462048210P09.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048210 P
[2023/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4151172
Date:22.03.2023
Language:EN
[2023/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP4151172
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2023
ClassificationIPC:A61B34/20, A61B34/30, A61B10/02, A61M25/01, // A61B90/30, A61B90/00
[2023/12]
CPC:
A61B10/0233 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61B34/30 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61B34/32 (US);
A61B34/10 (CN); A61B34/20 (EP,KR,US); A61M25/0113 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M25/0116 (EP,CN,KR,US); B25J9/161 (US); B25J9/1689 (US);
A61B2034/2061 (EP,KR,US); A61B2034/301 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61B2034/303 (US);
A61B2034/306 (EP,CN,KR,US); A61B2090/306 (EP,US); A61B2090/3614 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0166 (EP,CN,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/38]
Former [2023/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM MIT FÜHRUNGEN UND WERKZEUGEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER FLEXIBILITÄT[2023/45]
English:SYSTEM WITH GUIDES AND TOOLS OF DIFFERENT FLEXIBILITY[2023/12]
French:SYSTÈME AVEC GUIDES ET OUTILS DE FLEXIBILITÉ DIFFÉRENTE[2023/12]
Former [2023/12]SYSTEM MIT FÜHRUNGEN UND WERKZEUGE UNTERSCHIEDLICHER FLEXIBILITÄT
Examination procedure16.08.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2023Examination requested  [2023/38]
16.08.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.10.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2024Fee for grant paid
16.02.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.02.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15840939.1  / EP3190979
EP18204688.8  / EP3459488
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
09.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
26.09.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009012533  (BARBAGLI FEDERICO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011065993  (BELSON AMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2489394  (NAT UNIV CORP NAGOYA INST TECH [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0148] * * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0182] * * paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0199] *;
 [A]US2013109957  (T HOOFT GERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *
by applicantUS2009324161
 US7720322
 US2010331820
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.