blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4164218

EP4164218 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING POSITION OF CONTENT DISPLAYED ON DISPLAY BASED ON AMBIENT ILLUMINANCE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2025
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.04.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.09.2023
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.03.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2025New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2023/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Uhm, Junwhon
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
02 / Lee, Yunguk
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
03 / Kim, Seungnyun
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
04 / Yun, Yongsang
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
 [2023/15]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Berliner Freiheit 2
10785 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2023/15]Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date22211682.415.05.2019
[2023/15]
Priority number, dateKR2018005720818.05.2018         Original published format: KR 20180057208
[2023/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4164218
Date:12.04.2023
Language:EN
[2023/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4164218
Date:05.07.2023
Language:EN
[2023/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2023
ClassificationIPC:H04N13/117, H04N13/332
[2023/15]
CPC:
H04N13/344 (EP,US); H04N13/332 (CN); G06T19/006 (US);
G02B27/017 (EP,US); G06F3/0484 (US); H04N13/139 (US);
H04N13/156 (US); H04N13/239 (US); H04N13/279 (US);
H04N13/383 (US); H04N13/398 (CN); G02B2027/0183 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/44]
Former [2023/15]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER POSITION EINES AUF EINER ANZEIGE ANGEZEIGTEN INHALTS AUF BASIS DER UMGEBUNGSBELEUCHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON[2023/15]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING POSITION OF CONTENT DISPLAYED ON DISPLAY BASED ON AMBIENT ILLUMINANCE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME[2023/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR RÉGLER LA POSITION D'UN CONTENU AFFICHÉ SUR UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE SUR LA BASE DE L'ÉCLAIREMENT AMBIANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2023/15]
Examination procedure28.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2023Examination requested  [2023/44]
28.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.08.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2025Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP19802667.6  / EP3744087
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2002067366  (HIRAO AKINARI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP2565865  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]);
 [YA]US2014192092  (ARUGA NAOTO [JP], et al);
 [A]JP2015152746  (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.