blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4184058

EP4184058 - IMPROVED CLEANING DEVICE FOR A BIOMASS HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.04.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SL-Technik GmbH
Sommerauerstr. 1
5120 St. Pantaleon / AT
[2023/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Sommerauer, Thilo
5120 St. Pantaleon / AT
 [2023/21]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[2023/21]
Application number, filing date22213026.209.03.2021
[2023/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4184058
Date:24.05.2023
Language:DE
[2023/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.2023
ClassificationIPC:F23J3/02, F24H9/00, F24B13/00, F28G1/00, F28G1/06
[2023/21]
CPC:
F23B80/04 (EP); B03C3/014 (EP); B03C3/017 (EP);
B03C3/41 (EP); B03C3/49 (EP); B03C3/743 (EP);
B03C3/76 (EP); B03C3/88 (EP); F23B60/00 (EP);
F23J3/02 (EP); F23L9/02 (EP); F24B1/024 (EP);
F24H1/40 (EP); F24H9/0042 (EP); F28D7/16 (EP);
F28F1/40 (EP); F28F13/12 (EP); F28G1/06 (EP);
F28G15/04 (EP); B03C2201/08 (EP); B03C2201/10 (EP);
F24B13/006 (EP); F24B5/026 (EP); F28D2021/0024 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/22]
Former [2023/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE REINIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BIOMASSE-HEIZANLAGE[2023/21]
English:IMPROVED CLEANING DEVICE FOR A BIOMASS HEATING SYSTEM[2023/21]
French:DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE AMÉLIORÉ POUR INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE À BIOMASSE[2023/21]
Examination procedure15.12.2022Examination requested  [2023/21]
21.04.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.06.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.11.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP21161524.0  / EP4056900
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2233066  (JOHN E. WATSON) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 39 - page 3, line 21 * * figures 1-15 *;
 [A]DE1094912  (WILLIAM HERBERT SMITH) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 51 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]KR101149359B  (GYUWON TECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-21 * figures 1-3 und dazugehörige Passagen der Beschreibung *;
 [A]EP3064276  (GERLINGER ERNST [AT]) [A] 1,19 * column 3, paragraph 13 - column 4, paragraph 15 ** figure 1 *
by applicantEP1830130
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.