blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4320042

EP4320042 - STRUCTURAL FRAMEWORK COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE SYSTEMS plc
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2024/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, James, Martin
Bournemouth Dorset BH23 4JE / GB
02 / BISHOP, Simon
Bournemouth Dorset BH23 4JE / GB
03 / O'NEILL, James, Patrick
Bournemouth Dorset BH23 4JE / GB
 [2024/07]
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
Warwick House
P.O. Box 87
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[2024/07]
Application number, filing date22715367.301.04.2022
[2024/07]
WO2022GB50838
Priority number, dateGB2021000486406.04.2021         Original published format: GB 202104864
EP2021027503806.04.2021         Original published format: EP 21275038
[2024/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022214794
Date:13.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4320042
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:B64C7/00, B64C1/36, B64D47/08
[2024/07]
CPC:
B64C7/00 (EP); B64C1/061 (US); B64C1/36 (EP);
B64U20/65 (US); B64U2101/00 (US); B64U2101/15 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTURRAHMENKOMPONENTEN[2024/07]
English:STRUCTURAL FRAMEWORK COMPONENTS[2024/07]
French:COMPOSANTS STRUCTURAUX D'OSSATURE[2024/07]
Entry into regional phase09.10.2023National basic fee paid 
09.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/07]
09.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US2936617  (BEEBE WAYNE M) [X] 1,10 * figure - *;
 [X]US2005285598  (BARRINGER ANTHONY R [US]) [X] 1,10 * figure 4 *;
 [XAI]US2006091258  (CHIU TIEN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0050] - [0056]; figure - * [A] 4-9,11,13-15 [I] 3,12;
 [XAI]WO2017130137  (OPENSTRATOSPHERE SA [CH]) [X] 1,4-6,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0053] - [0063]; figure - * [A] 11 [I] 2,3,7-9,12;
 [A]WO2019097195  (AIRBUS DEFENCE & SPACE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.