blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4315481

EP4315481 - A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT OF BATTERY CELLS IN A BATTERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.09.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  20.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nerve Smart Systems A/S
Langebjergvænget 19 A
4000 Roskilde / DK
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / ROHDE, Gunnar
2610 Rødovre / DK
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)AWA Denmark A/S
Strandgade 56
1401 Copenhagen K / DK
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22715538.924.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022DK50059
Priority number, dateDK2021PA7013625.03.2021         Original published format: DK PA202170136
[2024/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022199773
Date:29.09.2022
Language:EN
[2022/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4315481
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2022
ClassificationIPC:H01M10/6551, H01M10/6553
[2024/06]
CPC:
H01M10/6551 (EP,US); H01M10/6553 (EP,US); H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/627 (EP,US); H01M10/653 (US); H01M10/6552 (US);
H01M50/552 (US); H01M50/562 (US); H01M2220/10 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEVERWALTUNG VON BATTERIEZELLEN IN EINEM BATTERIESYSTEM[2024/06]
English:A SYSTEM AND A METHOD FOR THERMAL MANAGEMENT OF BATTERY CELLS IN A BATTERY SYSTEM[2024/06]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION THERMIQUE DE CELLULES DE BATTERIE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase10.10.2023National basic fee paid 
10.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
10.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
10.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.202403   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2024
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]JP2002319388  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 24]; figures 1, 7, 8 * [Y] 5;
 [X]JP2009252652  (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * paragraph [0021]; figure 6 *;
 [Y]WO2010075100  (ISE CORP [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 61] , [0 72]; figures 3, 11A-C *;
 [X]US2020176836  (HWANG SEONG-JU [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6* paragraph [0065]; figure 2 *;
 [X]JP2020155286  (GS YUASA CORP) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantWO2018072799
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.