Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4322742 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2022256793 CA3212047 CN202280028485 EP2022060173W EP22715643 IL30593623 JP2023562905



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024514169Global Dossier 28.03.2024A
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL305936Global Dossier 01.11.2023A
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117136003Global Dossier 28.11.2023A
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3212047Global Dossier 20.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2022256793Global Dossier 22.02.2024A9
AU2022256793 28.09.2023A1
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4322742Global Dossier 21.02.2024A1
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112023021051 26.12.2023A2
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021
WO2022EP60173 15.04.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022219181Global Dossier 20.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21168630 15.04.2021