blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4323400

EP4323400 - TACI/BCMA DUAL BINDING MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kite Pharma, Inc.
C/o Gilead Sciences, Inc.
333 Lakeside Drive
Foster City, California 94404 / US
[2024/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BELK, Jonathan
Grantham, New Hampshire 03753 / US
02 / CHIVUKULA, Raghavender
Hayward, California 94541 / US
03 / DREVER, Matthew
Concord, California 94518 / US
04 / LIAO, Edward Hai Dhow
Foster City, California 94404 / US
05 / BOLOTIN, Eugene
Berkeley, California 94710 / US
 [2024/08]
Representative(s)Schnappauf, Georg
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[2024/08]
Application number, filing date22716738.425.03.2022
[2024/08]
WO2022US21997
Priority number, dateUS202163175997P16.04.2021         Original published format: US 202163175997 P
US202163209869P11.06.2021         Original published format: US 202163209869 P
US202163279477P15.11.2021         Original published format: US 202163279477 P
US202263310492P15.02.2022         Original published format: US 202263310492 P
[2024/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022221028
Date:20.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4323400
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/28, A61P35/02, A61K39/00, C07K14/725
[2024/08]
CPC:
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL,KR); A61K35/17 (US); A61K39/4611 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/4631 (EP,IL,KR); A61K39/464417 (EP,IL,KR); A61P35/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/04 (IL,KR,US); C07K14/7051 (EP,IL,KR); C12N5/0636 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,IL,KR); A61K2239/31 (EP,IL,KR); A61K2239/46 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR); C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR); C07K2317/73 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2319/03 (EP,IL,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TACI/BCMA-DOPPELBINDENDE MOLEKÜLE[2024/08]
English:TACI/BCMA DUAL BINDING MOLECULES[2024/08]
French:MOLÉCULES À LIAISON DOUBLE TACI/BCMA[2024/08]
Entry into regional phase03.11.2023National basic fee paid 
03.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/08]
03.11.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[I]WO02066516  (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [I] 1-9,13-26 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2015344583  (ARMITAGE RICHARD J [US], et al) [I] 1-9,13-26 * table 4 *;
 [A]  - Rebecca Larson ET AL, "Bispecific CAR T cells for multiple myeloma: natural ligand compared to tandem scFv design", J Immunol May 1, 2020, 204 (1 Supplement) 246.3;, (20200501), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://www.jimmunol.org/content/204/1_Supplement/246.3, (20220628), XP055936464 [A] 10-12 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LYDIA LEE ET AL, "An APRIL-based chimeric antigen receptor for dual targeting of BCMA and TACI in multiple myeloma", BLOOD, US, (20180215), vol. 131, no. 7, doi:10.1182/blood-2017-05-781351, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 746 - 758, XP055532620 [A] 10-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2017-05-781351
 [T]  - S V Kulemzin ET AL, "Engineering Chimeric Antigen Receptors", Acta Naturae, doi:10.32607/20758251-2017-9-1-6-14, (20170101), pages 6 - 14, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC5406655/pdf/AN20758251-09-01-006.pdf, (20190205), XP055552237 [T] 10-12 * page 10, left column *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.32607/20758251-2017-9-1-6-14
by applicantUS4873192
 US5728388
 US6319494
 US2002006409
 US2004014194
 US6682907
 WO2008081035
 US7709226
 US7741465
 US2013287748
 US2014050708
 US2014099309
 US2014154228
 US2014227237
    - KABAT EAWU TT, Ann NY Acad Sci, (19710000), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391
    - CHOTHIA CLESK AM, J Mol Biol, (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - AL-LAZIKANI B et al., J Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948
    - CHOTHIA C et al., J Mol Biol, (19920000), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817
    - TRAMONTANO A et al., J Mol Biol, (19900000), vol. 215, no. 1, pages 175 - 82
    - PATEL et al., Gene Therapy, (19990000), vol. 6, pages 412 - 419
    - MILONE et al., Molecular Therapy, (20090000), vol. 17, pages 1453 - 1464
    - ZHONG et al., Molecular Therapy, (20100000), vol. 18, pages 413 - 420
    - CARPENITO et al., PNAS, (20090000), vol. 106, pages 3360 - 3365
    - STAHLI et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19830000), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253
    - KIRKLAND et al., J. Immunol., (19860000), vol. 137, pages 3614 - 3619
    - MOREL et al., Molec. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 25, pages 7 - 15
    - CHEUNG et al., Virology, (19900000), vol. 176, pages 546 - 552
    - MOLDENHAUER et al., Scand. J. Immunol., (19900000), vol. 32, pages 77 - 82
    - GIEGE R et al., Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (19940000), vol. 50, pages 339 - 350
    - MCPHERSON A, Eur J Biochem, (19900000), vol. 189, pages 1 - 23
    - CHAYEN NE, Structure, (19970000), vol. 5, pages 1269 - 1274
    - MCPHERSON A, J Biol Chem, (19760000), vol. 251, pages 6300 - 6303
    - Meth Enzymol, (19850000), vol. 114
    - BRICOGNE G, Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (19930000), vol. 49, pages 37 - 60
    - BRICOGNE G, Meth Enzymol, (19970000), vol. 276A, pages 361 - 423
    - ROVERSI P et al., Acta Crystallogr D Biol Crystallogr, (20000000), vol. 56, pages 1316 - 1323
    - CHAMPE M et al., J Biol Chem, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 1388 - 1394
    - CUNNINGHAM BCWELLS JA, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085
    - DAYHOFF et al., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, (19780000), vol. 5, pages 345 - 352
    - HENIKOFF et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919
    - ALTSCHUL et al., "Basic local alignment search tool", J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, no. 3, doi:10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999, pages 403 - 410, XP002949123

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1990.9999
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Methods in Enzymology
    - "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - KLEIN et al., Protein Engineering, Design & Selection, (20140000), vol. 27, no. 10, pages 325 - 330
    - PRIYANKA et al., Protein Sci., (20130200), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 153 - 167
    - ESHHAR et al., Cancer Immunol Immunotherapy, (19970000), vol. 45, pages 131 - 136
    - KRAUSE et al., J. Exp. Med., (19980000), vol. 188, no. 4, pages 19 - 626
    - FINNEY et al., Journal of Immunology, (19980000), vol. 161, pages 2791 - 2797
    - BROWNLIE et al., Nature Rev. Immunol., (20130000), vol. 13, pages 257 - 269
    - LOVE et al., "Cold Spring Harb", Perspect. Biol, (20100000), vol. 2
    - SMITH-GARVIN et al., Annu. Rev. Immunol., (20090000), vol. 27, pages 591 - 619
    - BENDLE et al., J Immunol, (20130000), vol. 191, pages 3232 - 3239
    - VONG et al., Blood, (20170000), vol. 130, page 1791
    - KUNKEL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19850000), vol. 82, pages 488 - 492
    - KUNKEL et al., Methods in Enzymol, (19870000), vol. 154, pages 367 - 382
    - RYAN et al., J Gener. Viral., (19970000), vol. 78, pages 699 - 722
    - SCYMCZAK et al., Nature Biotech, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 589 - 594
    - DONNELLY et al., J Gen. Viral., (20010000), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041
    - CLEVER et al., J of Virology, (19950000), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 2101 - 2109
    - ZENNOU et al., Cell, (20000000), vol. 101, page 173
    - Y. SONEOKA et al., Nucl. Acids Res, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 628 - 633
    - N. R. LANDAU et al., J Virol., (19920000), vol. 66, pages 5110 - 5113
    - KAY, M.A., Chest, (19970000), vol. 111, pages 138S - 142S
    - FERRY, N.HEARD, J.M., Hum. Gene Ther., (19980000), vol. 9, pages 1975 - 81
    - SHIRATORY, Y. et al., Liver, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 265 - 74
    - OKA, K. et al., Curr. Opin. Lipidol., (20000000), vol. 11, pages 179 - 86
    - LIU, J.M., Gene Ther., (20000000), vol. 7, pages 1744 - 52
    - YANG, N. S., Crit. Rev. Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 12, pages 335 - 56
    - ALT, M., J Hepatol., (19950000), vol. 23, pages 746 - 58
    - BRODY, S. L.CRYSTAL, R.G., Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19940000), vol. 716, pages 90 - 101
    - STRAYER, D.S., Expert Opin. Investig. Drugs, (19990000), vol. 8, pages 2159 - 2172
    - BARTLETT, J. S., Curr. Cardiol. Rep., (20010000), vol. 3, pages 43 - 49
    - LEE, H. C. et al., Nature, (20000000), vol. 408, pages 483 - 8
 US20100631596
 WO2017US25351
 WO2018US39917
 WO2020US70157
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.