blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4314458

EP4314458 - SLIDING GATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.09.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abness Srl Società Benefit
Via Attilio Zordan, 1
36078 Valdagno (VI) / IT
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / CALEARO, Ugo
36070 Castelgomberto (VI) / IT
02 / CALEARO, Giuseppe
36070 Castelgomberto (VI) / IT
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Marchioro, Paolo
Studio Bonini S.r.l.
Corso Fogazzaro, 8
36100 Vicenza / IT
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22717262.423.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022IB52658
Priority number, dateIT2021000709424.03.2021         Original published format: IT202100007094
[2024/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022201062
Date:29.09.2022
Language:EN
[2022/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4314458
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2022
ClassificationIPC:E05D15/06
[2024/06]
CPC:
E05D15/0665 (EP); E05D15/0686 (EP); E05Y2201/614 (EP);
E05Y2201/616 (EP); E05Y2900/40 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHIEBETOR[2024/06]
English:SLIDING GATE[2024/06]
French:PORTE COULISSANTE[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2023National basic fee paid 
23.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
23.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1016769  (SCHMID PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] ** figures 1-14 *;
 [A]CN102606018  (ZHANGJIAGNG GOLDNET FENCING SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.