blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4323540

EP4323540 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR STORING A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  29.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2024/08]
Inventor(s)01 / LINNEN, Jeffrey M.
San Diego, California 92127 / US
02 / BRES, Vanessa
San Diego, California 92127 / US
03 / PENG, Lansha
San Diego, California 92127 / US
04 / PALACIOS MARTÍN, Lourdes
48160 Derio / ES
 [2024/08]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Hoffmann Eitle S.L.U.
Paseo de la Castellana 140, 3a planta
Edificio LIMA
28046 Madrid / ES
[2024/08]
Application number, filing date22717437.212.04.2022
[2024/08]
WO2022IB53406
Priority number, dateUS202163175961P16.04.2021         Original published format: US 202163175961 P
[2024/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022219514
Date:20.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4323540
Date:21.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/6806
[2024/08]
CPC:
C12Q1/6806 (EP,KR); C12Q2527/101 (KR); C12Q2527/119 (KR);
C12Q2527/125 (KR); C12Q2527/137 (KR)
C-Set:
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2527/101, C12Q2527/119, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2527/137 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR LAGERUNG EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE[2024/08]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR STORING A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE[2024/08]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE STOCKAGE D'ÉCHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE[2024/08]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2023National basic fee paid 
15.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/08]
15.11.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2004033470  (WHATMAN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11-15,18,39-44,46,50,51,54-58,64,73-79,81,87-91,93 * page 16, line 7 - page 21, line 6 * * page 25, paragraph 4 - page 26 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-76 * * page 29, paragraph 3 * [Y] 20-38 [I] 2,6,10,16,17,35-38,45,47-49,52,53,59-63,65-72,80,92,94-96;
 [I]WO2006133385  (GEN PROBE INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0075] , [ 133] , [ 161] - [0171] *;
 [I]US2009233309  (FISCHER GERALD W [US], et al) [I] 1-96 * claims 1-30 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0065] - [0118] - [0119] - [0144] , [0158] - [0172] - [0210] * * tables 1-4 *;
 [XI]WO2010093861  (UNIV CALFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,17,18,20-28,30-37,39-44,46,50,51,54-58,60,62,64-70,73-79,81,83,85-91,93 * claims 1-80 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0013] , [0125] - [0127] - [0134] , [0139] - [0142] - [0145] , [0168] * * examples 4-12 * [I] 6,10,16,19,29,38,45,47-49,52,53,61,63,65,71,72,80,82,84,92,94-96;
 [I]WO2015131291  (DNA GENOTEK INC [CA]) [I] 1-96 * claims 1-87 * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 15 - page 28, paragraph 1 * * tables 1-3 ** examples 1-12 *;
 [XI]US9999217  (WHITNEY SCOTT E [US], et al) [X] 1-48,50-62,64-71,73-83,85-95 * claims 1-14 * * tables 3-4 * * column 4, paragraph 3 * * page 167, paragraph 2 * * column 5, paragraphs 2-3 * * column 8, paragraph 5 * * column 9, paragraph 3 - column 10, paragraph 3 * * column 197, paragraph 1 * * column 200, paragraph last - column 202, paragraph 2 * * examples 7-12 * * column 211, paragraph 1 * [I] 49,63,72,84,96;
 [I]WO2020005584  (GEN PROBE INC [US]) [I] 1-96 * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-21 *;
 [XYI]CN111925941B  (BEIJING GENEWILL MEDICAL LABORATORY CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,18,39-44,48-55,57,58,62-67,71-79,83-91,95,96 * Control group 1 * * claims 1-6 * * the whole document * [Y] 20-38 [I] 6,10,16,17,45-47,56,59-61,68-70,80-82,93,94
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.