blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4314092

EP4314092 - CATIONICALLY CHARGED MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujifilm Manufacturing Europe BV
Oudenstaart 1
5047 TK Tilburg / NL
For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 106-8620 / JP
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN RIJEN, Adrianus Jacobus
5047 TK Tilburg / NL
02 / HESSING, Jacko
5047 TK Tilburg / NL
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)HGF
HGF BV
Benoordenhoutseweg 46
2596 BC The Hague / NL
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22718867.924.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022EP57852
Priority number, dateGB2021000440829.03.2021         Original published format: GB 202104408
[2024/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022207470
Date:06.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4314092
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:C08F126/06, C08F226/06, B01D15/36, B01D61/44, B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/44, B01D71/58, B01J41/14, C09D4/00
[2024/06]
CPC:
C08F126/06 (EP); B01D71/44 (US); B01D61/44 (EP);
B01D69/02 (EP); B01D71/62 (EP); C08F226/06 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP); B01D2325/42 (EP); B01D61/364 (EP);
C07D213/20 (EP); C07D233/58 (EP); C07D277/22 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C08F226/06, C08F212/26 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F226/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATIONISCH GELADENE MEMBRANEN[2024/06]
English:CATIONICALLY CHARGED MEMBRANES[2024/06]
French:MEMBRANES CHARGÉES CATIONIQUEMENT[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2023National basic fee paid 
26.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
26.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2014378561  (VAN BERCHUM BASTIAAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,8,14-17,19,21,23,24 * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0042] , [0044] , [0008] , [0132] , [0156] , [0170] , [0176] , [0184] , [0185]; claims 1-7, 9, 13-17, 19, 20, 12-28 *[A] 22;
 [X]  - LI ZHEN ET AL, "Constructing efficient ion nanochannels in alkaline anion exchange membranes by the in situ assembly of a poly(ionic liquid) in metal-organic frameworks", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY A, GB, vol. 4, no. 6, doi:10.1039/C5TA10452A, ISSN 2050-7488, (20160101), pages 2340 - 2348, URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/articlepdf/2016/ta/c5ta10452a, (20220707), XP055939392 [X] 1,3-12,14,15,17,19,23,24 * abstract * * schemes 1, 2, experimental section, conclusion;; figures 1-8 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5TA10452A
 [X]  - ALESSANDRO DANI ET AL, "Stable covalently photo-cross-linked poly(ionic liquid) membrane with gradient pore size", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20181001), doi:10.1002/MARC.201700167, XP081416694 [X] 1,3,5-7,9-12,14,17,19-21,24 * results and discussion, scheme 1; page 3 - page 7 * * conclusion; page 8 * * 3rd paragraph; page 13 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.201700167
 [X]  - Carter Blaine M ET AL, "Preparation and characterization of crosslinked poly(vinylimidazolium) anion exchange membranes for artificial photosynthesis", Journal of materials chemistry. A, Materials for energy and sustainability, Cambridge, doi:10.1039/c9ta00498j, (20191022), pages 23818 - 23829, URL: https://pubs.rsc.org/en/content/getauthorversionpdf/c9ta00498j, (20220707), XP055939644 [X] 1-6,9-14,16-21,23,24 * scheme 1: monomers 1, 1a, sections 2.2.3, 2.2.5, 2.3, 3.2 * * results and discussion; pages 15-26; figures 3-6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c9ta00498j
by applicantJPS473981B
 JPS476416B
 JPS4722326B
 JPS4723664B
 JPS5730704
 US4318791
 JPS5942864B
 JPS6026483B
 JPS6026403B
 JPS61194062
 JPS6281345
 EP0284561
 JPS6361950B
 JPH0134242B
 JPH029597B
 JPH029596B
 JPH02211452
 JP2008105379
 JP2009114290
 US2016177006
    - RADIATION CURING IN POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19930000), pages 77 - 117
    - KATO KIYOMI, Ultraviolet Curing System, Research Center Co., Ltd., (19890000), pages 65 - 148
    - MARCUS D HANWELLDONALD E CURTISDAVID C LONIETIM VANDERMEERSCHEVA ZUREKGEOFFREY R HUTCHISON, "Avogadro: An advanced semantic chemical editor, visualization, and analysis platform", Journal of Cheminformatics, (20120000), vol. 4, doi:10.1186/1758-2946-4-17, page 17, XP021138024

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1758-2946-4-17
    - DLUGOLECKI et al., J. of Membrane Science, (20080000), vol. 319, pages 217 - 218
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.