blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4314223

EP4314223 - WASHING OR CLEANING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / FREY, Till
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / KREIS, Michael
51377 Leverkusen / DE
03 / SCHMIEDEL, Peter
40591 Düsseldorf / DE
04 / GEBERT-SCHWARZWAELDER, Antje
41469 Neuss / DE
 [2024/06]
Application number, filing date22718917.229.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022EP58190
Priority number, dateDE20211020317830.03.2021         Original published format: DE102021203178
[2024/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022207590
Date:06.10.2022
Language:DE
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4314223
Date:07.02.2024
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/37, C11D11/00, C11D17/00
[2024/06]
CPC:
C11D3/3753 (EP); C11D17/003 (EP); C11D2111/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL[2024/06]
English:WASHING OR CLEANING AGENTS[2024/06]
French:AGENTS DE LAVAGE OU DE NETTOYAGE[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase13.07.2023National basic fee paid 
13.07.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
13.07.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2018138124  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-15 * Seite 1, erster Absatz * * table 5 * * Seite 53, letzter Absatz * * Seite 54, mittlerer Abschnit * * claims 1, 12, 13 *;
 [X]EP3770242  (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * tables 3, 4 ** paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0223] *;
 [T]  - Hansen Charles M, "Hansen Solubility Parameters - A user's handbook, second edition", ISBN 978-0-8493-7248-3, (20071230), pages 1 - 546, URL: https://www.hansen-solubility.com/Charles-Hansen/thehandbook.php, (20220622), XP055934364 [T] 1-15 * page 6 - page 9 * * Seite 13, vorletzter Absatz * * Seite 21, letzter Absatz - Seite 22, letzter Absatz * * tables 1.1, 1.2, 1.3 *
 [T]  - Hansen Charles M, "Hansen Solubility Parameters - A user's handbook, second edition", ISBN 978-0-8493-7248-3, (20071230), pages 1 - 546, URL: https://www.hansen-solubility.com/Charles-Hansen/thehandbook.php, (20220623), XP055934606 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [L]  - ALQARNI MOHAMMED H ET AL, "Solubility data, Hansen solubility parameters and thermodynamic behavior of pterostilbene in some pure solvents and different (PEG-400 + water) cosolvent compositions", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR LIQUIDS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 331, doi:10.1016/J.MOLLIQ.2021.115700, ISSN 0167-7322, (20210220), (20210220), XP086549726 [L] 1-14 * table 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molliq.2021.115700
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.