blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4326910

EP4326910 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RAW JUICE FOR MAKING SUGAR, PROCESS FOR MAKING SUGAR, AND SUGAR-PRODUCTION INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  27.05.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfeifer & Langen IP GmbH
Aachener Straße 1042 a
50858 Köln / DE
[2024/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BURKHARDT, Mark-Oliver
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
02 / KLOSTERHALFEN, Wolfgang
50170 Kerpen / DE
 [2024/09]
Representative(s)Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[2024/09]
Application number, filing date22724094.221.04.2022
[2024/09]
WO2022EP60614
Priority number, dateEP2021017022123.04.2021         Original published format: EP 21170221
[2024/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022223728
Date:27.10.2022
Language:DE
[2022/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4326910
Date:28.02.2024
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:C13B5/04, C13B10/00, C13B10/02, C13B10/12, C13K1/00, G01N21/359, C13B10/06, G01N21/84, C13B5/06
[2024/09]
CPC:
C13B5/06 (EP); C13B10/02 (EP); C13B10/12 (EP);
G01N21/359 (EP); G01N2021/8416 (EP); G01N2021/8466 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ROHSAFT FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ZUCKER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUCKER UND ZUCKERPRODUKTIONSANLAGE[2024/09]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RAW JUICE FOR MAKING SUGAR, PROCESS FOR MAKING SUGAR, AND SUGAR-PRODUCTION INSTALLATION[2024/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE JUS BRUT POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SUCRE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SUCRE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE SUCRE[2024/09]
Entry into regional phase29.09.2023National basic fee paid 
29.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
29.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/09]
29.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US6630672  (BROTHERTON GEORGE ALEXANDER [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,11,14 * column 3, line 48 - line 61 * * column 8, line 23 - line 32 * * figures 1-6; claims 1-16 *;
 [I]US2010285186  (KANNAR DAVID [AU], et al) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0134]; example 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * figure A; claims 1-12 *;
 [I]CN102230885  (CHINA FOOD INDUSTRY PROMOTION CT) [I] 1-17* abstract *;
 [XI]WO2020027731  (NUTRITION SCIENCE DESIGN PTE LTD [SG]) [X] 1,7,11-14 * page 31, line 33 - page 32, line 3 * * page 32, line 22 - page 33, line 3 * * page 41, line 20 - line 28 * * page 46, line 8 - line 9 * * figures 1-17; claims 1-23 * [I] 2-6,8-10,15-17
by applicantUS6630672
 WO2020027731
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.