blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4316653

EP4316653 - CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd.
1-11-1, Osaki
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-8584 / JP
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / TANAKA, Hiroki
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0025 / JP
02 / MORITA, Itaru
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0025 / JP
03 / NAGAO, Yuki
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0025 / JP
04 / ENDO, Yoshinori
Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0025 / JP
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22779758.601.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022JP08673
Priority number, dateJP2021005855830.03.2021         Original published format: JP 2021058558
JP2021005853130.03.2021         Original published format: JP 2021058531
JP2021018889419.11.2021         Original published format: JP 2021188894
[2024/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022209533
Date:06.10.2022
Language:JA
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4316653
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:B01J23/63, B01D53/94, B01J35/04, F01N3/10, F01N3/28
[2024/06]
CPC:
F01N3/10 (EP); B01J23/63 (EP,US); B01D53/94 (EP,US);
B01J21/04 (US); B01J21/066 (EP); B01J23/002 (US);
B01J23/10 (US); B01J35/394 (US); B01J35/40 (US);
B01J35/57 (EP); B01J35/613 (US); B01J37/0215 (EP);
B01J37/038 (EP); F01N3/2803 (US); B01D2255/1021 (US);
B01D2255/1025 (US); B01D2255/407 (US); B01D2255/908 (US);
B01D2258/01 (US); B01J23/464 (EP); B01J2523/22 (US);
B01J2523/31 (US); B01J2523/36 (US); B01J2523/3706 (US);
B01J2523/3712 (US); B01J2523/3718 (US); B01J2523/3725 (US);
B01J2523/48 (US); F01N2370/02 (US); F01N2510/06 (EP);
F01N2510/068 (EP); Y02A50/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG UND KATALYSATOR ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG[2024/06]
English:CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION[2024/06]
French:COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR POUR PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET CATALYSEUR DE PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2023Translation filed 
28.09.2023National basic fee paid 
28.09.2023Search fee paid 
28.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2009208045  (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1-6 * claims 1-4, paragraphs [0052]-[0063] *;
 [A]WO2010131369  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-6* claims 1-10, paragraphs [0065]-[0070] *;
 [A]WO2019163435  (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-12, paragraphs [0067]-[0074] *
by applicantJP2006297372
 JP2017039069
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.