blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4314653

EP4314653 - ACTIVE AND PASSIVE COMBUSTION STABILIZATION FOR BURNERS FOR HIGHLY AND RAPIDLY VARYING FUEL GAS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Intellectual Property Services Group
855 S. Mint Street
Charlotte, NC 28202 / US
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / KRAUS, Kurt
Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 / US
02 / BIETTO, Stefano
Charlotte, North Carolina 28202 / US
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22782395.228.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022US71387
Priority number, dateUS202163167286P29.03.2021         Original published format: US 202163167286 P
US20211745193222.10.2021         Original published format: US202117451932
[2024/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022213055
Date:06.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4314653
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:F23D14/22, F23N5/08, F23G7/06, F23C9/06
[2024/06]
CPC:
F23D14/22 (EP,US); F23N1/002 (US); F23D14/48 (US);
F23D14/70 (EP); F23D17/00 (EP); F23G7/065 (EP);
F23D2209/20 (EP,US); F23D2900/14002 (EP,US); F23D2900/14003 (EP);
F23K2900/05004 (EP,US); F23N2235/16 (US); F23N2235/24 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AKTIVE UND PASSIVE VERBRENNUNGSSTABILISIERUNG FÜR BRENNER FÜR HOCH- UND SCHNELL WECHSELNDE BRENNGASZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2024/06]
English:ACTIVE AND PASSIVE COMBUSTION STABILIZATION FOR BURNERS FOR HIGHLY AND RAPIDLY VARYING FUEL GAS COMPOSITIONS[2024/06]
French:STABILISATION DE COMBUSTION ACTIVE ET PASSIVE POUR BRÛLEURS POUR COMPOSITIONS DE GAZ COMBUSTIBLE À VARIATION ÉLEVÉE ET RAPIDE[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2023National basic fee paid 
27.09.2023Search fee paid 
27.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0772001  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002], [0020], [0023], [0029]-[0032] and figures 1, 6-8 *;
 [A]US6499990  (ZINK DARTON J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 38 - column 8, line 17 and figures 1-2 *;
 [A]US2017159938  (BARNHART DAVID RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0028]-[0034] and figure 1 *;
 [A]US2019093881  (RISSEEUW IZAAK [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0032]-[0035] and figures 3-4 *;
 [Y]CN111928240  (HANGZHOU CHUKING TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0037]-[0038], claim 1, and figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.