blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4320620

EP4320620 - LASER PROJECTION FOR CNC WORKPIECE POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Standex International Corporation
23 Keewaydin Drive, Suite 300
Salem, New Hampshire 03079 / US
[2024/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MORUZZI, Massimiliano
Salem, NJ 03879 / US
02 / IORIO, Francesco
Salem, NJ 03879 / US
 [2024/07]
Representative(s)Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[2024/07]
Application number, filing date22785409.806.04.2022
[2024/07]
WO2022US23744
Priority number, dateUS202163171226P06.04.2021         Original published format: US 202163171226 P
US20221771409205.04.2022         Original published format: US202217714092
[2024/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022216883
Date:13.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4320620
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:G16C10/00
[2024/07]
CPC:
G05B19/4068 (EP); G05B19/402 (EP,US); G05B19/182 (US);
G05B19/4099 (US); G05B2219/31048 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LASERPROJEKTION FÜR CNC-WERKSTÜCKPOSITIONIERUNG[2024/07]
English:LASER PROJECTION FOR CNC WORKPIECE POSITIONING[2024/07]
French:PROJECTION LASER PERMETTANT UN POSITIONNEMENT DE PIÈCE PAR COMMANDE NUMÉRIQUE[2024/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2023National basic fee paid 
30.10.2023Search fee paid 
30.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/07]
14.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2010153058  (CROTHERS PHILLIP JOHN [AU], et al) [X] 1-9, 12-20 * , entire document, especially Abstract and para [0041]-[0042], [0046], [0081], [0105] and FIG. 5. * [Y] 10-11;
 [Y]US2021096535  (WIGAND JOHN THEODORE [US]) [Y] 10-11* ,entire document, especially Abstract and para [0044]. *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.