blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4318976

EP4318976 - OPTICAL SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.11.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Qiang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / ZHOU, Rui
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / JI, Xiaofan
Tianjin 300072 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Lin
Tianjin 300072 / CN
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Karlstraße 7
80333 München / DE
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22794506.001.04.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022CN84789
Priority number, dateCN20211045017225.04.2021         Original published format: CN202110450172
[2024/06]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022228034
Date:03.11.2022
Language:ZH
[2022/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4318976
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:H04B10/291
[2024/06]
CPC:
H04J14/04 (EP,US); H04B10/2916 (EP,CN); H04J14/02216 (US);
H01S3/06766 (EP); H01S3/0677 (EP); H01S3/094069 (EP);
H01S3/094096 (EP); H01S3/13013 (EP); H04B10/07955 (US);
H04B10/2942 (CN); H01S3/06737 (EP); H01S3/06758 (EP);
H01S3/094003 (EP); H01S3/1608 (EP); H01S3/2375 (EP);
H01S3/2391 (EP); H01S3/302 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG OPTISCHER SIGNALE[2024/06]
English:OPTICAL SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION APPARATUS AND METHOD[2024/06]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMPLIFICATION DE SIGNAL OPTIQUE[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase25.10.2023Translation filed 
25.10.2023National basic fee paid 
25.10.2023Search fee paid 
25.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
25.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]CN101588208  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-15 * entire document *;
 [A]US2010266284  (ZHU BENYUAN [US]) [A] 1-15* entire document *;
 [A]CN112383357  (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) [A] 1-15 * entire document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.