blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4342614

EP4342614 - BONDED OBJECT PRODUCTION METHOD AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR CERAMIC CIRCUIT SUBSTRATE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.11.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome
Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-0023 / JP
For all designated states
Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd.
8, Shinsugita-Cho
Isogo-Ku
Yokohama-Shi
Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
[2024/13]
Inventor(s)01 / KATO, Hiromasa
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
02 / HOSHINO, Masanori
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
03 / HIRABAYASHI, Hideaki
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
04 / SUENAGA, Seiichi
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
05 / MORIMOTO, Kazumitsu
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP
 [2024/13]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[2024/13]
Application number, filing date22804680.117.05.2022
[2024/13]
WO2022JP20521
Priority number, dateJP2021008432019.05.2021         Original published format: JP 2021084320
[2024/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022244769
Date:24.11.2022
Language:JA
[2022/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4342614
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.11.2022
ClassificationIPC:B23K1/00, B23K1/008, B23K1/19, H01L23/13, B32B15/04, B32B15/20, C04B37/02, H05K3/38
[2024/13]
CPC:
H01L21/4807 (EP,US); H01L21/2007 (US); B23K1/00 (EP);
B23K1/008 (EP); B23K1/19 (EP); B32B15/04 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP); C04B37/02 (EP); H01L21/02002 (EP);
H01L21/0217 (US); H01L21/164 (US); H01L23/13 (EP);
H05K1/0306 (EP); H05K3/022 (EP); H05K3/38 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR GEBUNDENE OBJEKTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR KERAMISCHE SCHALTUNGSSUBSTRATE DAMIT[2024/13]
English:BONDED OBJECT PRODUCTION METHOD AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR CERAMIC CIRCUIT SUBSTRATE USING SAME[2024/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'OBJET LIÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION POUR SUBSTRAT DE CIRCUIT CÉRAMIQUE LE METTANT EN OEUVRE[2024/13]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2023Translation filed 
10.11.2023National basic fee paid 
10.11.2023Search fee paid 
10.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5693845  (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [A] 1-19  ;
 [Y]JPH03290378  (DOWA MINING CO) [Y] 1-19 * p. 4, lower left column, lines 4-6, p. 5, upper left column, table 1, upper right column, lines 16-18 *;
 [Y]JPH0532463  (DOWA MINING CO) [Y] 10, 16-19 * paragraphs [0001], [0002], [0004], [0005] *;
 [A]JPH07187839  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-19 ;
 [A]JPH11157952  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-19  ;
 [Y]JP2002274964  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-19 * claims, paragraph [0016] *;
 [Y]KR20030053245  (RES INST IND SCIENCE & TECH [KR]) [Y] 1-19 * p. 3, lines 36-39 *;
 [A]JP2003283064  (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-19;
 [Y]WO2018199060  (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraphs [0022]-[0024], [0031] *
by applicantJPH07187839
 JP6789955B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.