blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4328654

EP4328654 - VIDEO DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kyocera Corporation
6 Takeda Tobadono-cho
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
[2024/09]
Inventor(s)01 / SHINTANI, Takeshi
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
02 / SADAMOTO, Hiromichi
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
03 / NAKAJIMA, Yasushi
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP
04 / INAMI, Masahiko
Tokyo 151-0051 / JP
 [2024/09]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2024/09]
Application number, filing date22816169.101.06.2022
[2024/09]
WO2022JP22391
Priority number, dateJP2021009312702.06.2021         Original published format: JP 2021093127
[2024/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022255424
Date:08.12.2022
Language:JA
[2022/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4328654
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:G02B27/01, B60K35/00, G02B30/35, G02B30/60, H04N13/346, H04N13/363, H04N13/383
[2024/09]
CPC:
H04N13/363 (EP); B60K35/00 (EP); G02B27/0093 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (EP); G02B30/26 (EP); H04N13/346 (EP);
H04N13/383 (EP); G02B2027/0134 (EP); G02B2027/0138 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VIDEOANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2024/09]
English:VIDEO DISPLAY DEVICE[2024/09]
French:DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE VIDÉO[2024/09]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2023Translation filed 
22.11.2023National basic fee paid 
22.11.2023Search fee paid 
22.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2006088722  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7 * entire text, all drawings *;
 [A]JP2011070074  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * entire text, all drawings *;
 [A]WO2017013739  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * entire text, all drawings *;
 [A]WO2019097918  (MAXELL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * entire text, all drawings *;
 [A]US2020073120  (VON SPIEGEL WOLFF [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* entire text, all drawings *;
 [A]JP2020116965  (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1-7 * entire text, all drawings *
by applicantJP2001042251
 JP2006044596
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.