blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4326468

EP4326468 - CUTTING INSERT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2024Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
26.01.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 28.02.2024  [2024/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VARGUS Ltd.
1 Hayotsrim Street
22311 Nahariya / IL
[2024/09]
Inventor(s)01 / BOOKS, Baruch
2514700 Kfar Vradim / IL
02 / TULCHINSKY, Evgeni
2907917 Kiryat Yam / IL
03 / MORGULIS, Rafael
2194012 14/20 Jasmin str. / IL
 [2024/09]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Valet Patent Services Limited
c/o Caya 83713X
Am Börstig 5
96052 Bamberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2024/09]Sach, Greg Robert
Valet Patent Services Limited
Landsberger Str. 302
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date22819714.103.06.2022
[2024/09]
WO2022IB55188
Priority number, dateUS202163197457P06.06.2021         Original published format: US 202163197457 P
[2024/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022259104
Date:15.12.2022
Language:EN
[2022/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4326468
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL15.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:B23B27/16, B23B27/00
[2024/09]
CPC:
B23B27/065 (EP,KR); B23B27/00 (IL); B23B27/1614 (KR);
B23B27/141 (EP); B23B27/16 (IL); B23B2200/049 (EP,KR);
B23B2200/085 (EP,KR); B23B2200/087 (EP,KR); B23B2200/125 (EP);
B23B2200/126 (KR); B23B2200/3663 (EP,KR); B23B2205/04 (KR);
B23B2205/12 (EP); B23B2205/16 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHNEIDEINSATZ[2024/09]
English:CUTTING INSERT[2024/09]
French:INSERT DE COUPE[2024/09]
Entry into regional phase23.11.2023National basic fee paid 
23.11.2023Search fee paid 
23.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
23.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/09]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005019111  (KITAGAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009252565  (MORGULIS RAFAEL [IL]) [A] 1,8,9 * See figures 1 and 3 and description thereof *;
 [A]US2018339350  (MURA HISANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,9* paragraph 0124 figs 6A-6D: negative insert 1 *;
 [A]US2020108449  (BRODSKI ARIE [IL], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1-3, paragraph 0042: negative rake angle *;
 [A]  - Anonymous �, "Difference Between Positive Rake and Negative Rake", (20180126), URL: www.difference.minaprem.com/machining/difference-between-positive-rake-and-negative-rake, (20230112), XP093013514 [A] 1,9 * See table 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.