blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4321246

EP4321246 - METHOD FOR PREPARING TITANIUM-BASED LITHIUM ION EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2024Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
12.01.2024Request for examination filedpublished on 14.02.2024  [2024/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chengdu Chemphys Chemical Industry Co., Ltd
Tower 3-1101, Yintai Center
1199 North Tianfu Ave
Hi-Tech District
Chengdu
Sichuan 610041 / CN
For all designated states
Sinolithium Materials Limited
Unit 1102 11/f 29 Austin Road Tsim Sha Tsui KL
Tsim Sha Tsui KL, Hong Kong 621000 / HK
[2024/07]
Inventor(s)01 / MENG, Qiang
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
02 / DAI, Yihua
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Lei
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
04 / YANG, Jinfeng
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
05 / BAN, Wenjun
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
06 / CAI, Rongfu
Chengdu, Sichuan 610041 / CN
 [2024/07]
Representative(s)Ipside
7-9 Allée Haussmann
33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2024/07]Ipside
7-9 Allées Haussmann
33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date22891858.702.11.2022
[2024/07]
WO2022CN129139
Priority number, dateCN20211134879715.11.2021         Original published format: CN202111348797
[2024/07]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023083062
Date:19.05.2023
Language:ZH
[2023/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4321246
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.05.2023
ClassificationIPC:B01J20/02, B01J20/30, C01G23/00, H01M4/485
[2024/07]
CPC:
C01G23/005 (EP,CN); B01J20/04 (CN); B01J20/0203 (CN);
B01J20/30 (CN); C01G23/00 (CN); C01G23/003 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP,CN); C01P2002/72 (EP,CN); C01P2004/03 (EP,CN);
C01P2004/62 (EP,CN); C01P2006/12 (EP); Y02E60/10 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/07]
Extension statesBA06.11.2023
Validation statesKH06.11.2023
MA06.11.2023
MD06.11.2023
TN06.11.2023
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LITHIUM-IONEN-AUSTAUSCHERS AUF TITANBASIS[2024/07]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING TITANIUM-BASED LITHIUM ION EXCHANGER[2024/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ÉCHANGEUR LITHIUM-ION À BASE DE TITANE[2024/07]
Entry into regional phase06.11.2023Translation filed 
06.11.2023National basic fee paid 
06.11.2023Search fee paid 
06.11.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2023Examination requested  [2024/07]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.