blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4322042

EP4322042 - SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.05.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited
No. 2 Xingang Road
Zhangwan Town
Jiaocheng District
Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN
[2024/07]
Inventor(s)01 / SHI, Deqiang
Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN
 [2024/07]
Representative(s)Behr, Wolfgang
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
[2024/07]
Application number, filing date22893942.727.06.2022
[2024/07]
WO2022CN101680
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2024000127
Date:04.01.2024
Language:ZH
[2024/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4322042
Date:14.02.2024
Language:EN
[2024/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN04.01.2024
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2024
ClassificationIPC:G06Q10/0633, G06Q10/08, G06Q10/067, G06Q10/087
[2024/15]
CPC:
G06Q10/08 (EP,US); G06Q10/0633 (EP,US); G06Q10/067 (EP);
G06Q10/087 (EP)
Former IPC [2024/07]G06F30/20, G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLANUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM[2024/07]
English:SCHEDULING METHOD AND APPARATUS, SYSTEM, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM[2024/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PLANIFICATION, SYSTÈME, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT[2024/07]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2023Translation filed 
22.05.2023National basic fee paid 
22.05.2023Search fee paid 
22.05.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2023Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2023Examination requested  [2024/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2018300435  (ECKMAN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0 35] - [0043] - [0082] , [0 84]; figures 1, 5; claims 1-22 *;
 [A]CN110807236  (SHENZHEN INST ADV TECH) [A] 1-15 * figure all; claim all *;
 [A]US10783462  (MO WENTING [CN], et al) [A] 1-15* figure all; claim all *;
 [A]CN111738663  (KUNMING DONGDIAN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figure all; claim all *;
 [A]CN215709068U  (BEIJING JINGDONG QIANSHI TECH CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * figure all; claim all *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.